This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2023 at 09:00:09 (UTC).

North American Company for Life and Health Insurance v. Macus

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 North American Company for Life and Health Insurance filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Macus. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Aileen M. Cannon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-14028

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aileen M. Cannon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

North American Company for Life and Health Insurance

Defendant

Alexs Macus

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua D. Lerner

Jessica Kerbel

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER on Default Final Judgment Procedure. Plaintiff's Motion for Default Final Judgment or Notice of Joint Liability due 4/6/2023. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/23/2023. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

#12

(#12) Clerk's Entry of Default as to Alexs Macus - Motions Terminated: #10 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 3/22/2023. (cds) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

#11

(#11) ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SEEK CLERK'S DEFAULT. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff shall file a Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default on or before March 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/22/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

10 #1

Exhibit Order Entering Clerk's Default

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT, Alexs Macus response/answer due 3/16/2023. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/9/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #6 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. Alexs Macus served on 2/13/2023, response/answer due 3/6/2023. (Kerbel, Jessica) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Alexs Macus. (jas) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

6 #2

Summon(s) to Alexs Macus

6 #1

Exhibit 1 - Policy

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ( Amended Complaint due by 2/9/2023.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/3/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance identifying Corporate Parent Sammons Financial Group, Inc. for North American Company for Life and Health Insurance (Kerbel, Jessica) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Alexs Macus. (nwn) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summon(s) to Alexs Macus

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER on Default Final Judgment Procedure. Plaintiff's Motion for Default Final Judgment or Notice of Joint Liability due 4/6/2023. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/23/2023. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Clerk's Entry of Default as to Alexs Macus - Motions Terminated: #10 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 3/22/2023. (cds) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SEEK CLERK'S DEFAULT. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff shall file a Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default on or before March 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/22/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Alexs Macus by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Entering Clerk's Default)(Kerbel, Jessica) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT, Alexs Macus response/answer due 3/16/2023. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/9/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #6 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. Alexs Macus served on 2/13/2023, response/answer due 3/6/2023. (Kerbel, Jessica) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Alexs Macus. (jas) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Rescission and Declaratory Judgment against Alexs Macus, filed by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Summon(s) to Alexs Macus)(Kerbel, Jessica) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ( Amended Complaint due by 2/9/2023.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/3/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance identifying Corporate Parent Sammons Financial Group, Inc. for North American Company for Life and Health Insurance (Kerbel, Jessica) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Alexs Macus. (nwn) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Rescission and Declaratory Judgment against Alexs Macus. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16291166, filed by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Policy, #2 Summon(s) to Alexs Macus, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kerbel, Jessica) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less