This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2023 at 07:49:03 (UTC).

North American Co for Life & Health Ins v. Pouncey

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 North American Co for Life Health Ins filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Pouncey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarala V. Nagala and Thomas O. Farrish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00137

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarala V. Nagala

Referral Judge

Thomas O. Farrish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

North American Co for Life & Health Ins

Defendant

Roberto Pouncey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tracey Salmon-Smith

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A. Application

1 #2

Exhibit B. Policy

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance identifying Corporate Parent Sammons Financial Group, Inc. for North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Salmon-Smith, Tracey) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#4

(#4) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/3/2023. Discovery due by 8/4/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 9/8/2023. Signed by Clerk on 2/2/2023. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 2/2/2023. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#6

(#6) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 2/2/2023. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #6 Protective Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by North American Co for Life & Health Ins, #1 Complaint, filed by North American Co for Life & Health Ins. Signed by Clerk on 2/3/2023. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Roberto Pouncey* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tracey Salmon-Smith* *Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP* *600 Campus Drive* *Florham Park, NJ 07932*. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Roberto Pouncey* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tracey Salmon-Smith* *Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP* *600 Campus Drive* *Florham Park, NJ 07932*. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #6 Protective Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by North American Co for Life & Health Ins, #1 Complaint, filed by North American Co for Life & Health Ins. Signed by Clerk on 2/3/2023. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 2/2/2023. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 2/2/2023. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/3/2023. Discovery due by 8/4/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 9/8/2023. Signed by Clerk on 2/2/2023. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketJudge Sarala V. Nagala and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • Docket(#3) Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/2/2023.(Anastasio, F.) Modified on 2/3/2023 to correct file date (Freberg, B). (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to Roberto Pouncey. (Salmon-Smith, Tracey) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance identifying Corporate Parent Sammons Financial Group, Inc. for North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Salmon-Smith, Tracey) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Roberto Pouncey ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7222927.), filed by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Application, #2 Exhibit B. Policy)(Salmon-Smith, Tracey) Modified on 2/3/2023 to correct parties (Anastasio, F.). (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less