This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2021 at 08:21:30 (UTC).

North American Capacity Insurance Company et al v. Lemonade, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 North American Capacity Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Lemonade, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-08153

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

North American Capacity Insurance Company

Arch Specialty Insurance Company

Peleus Insurance Company

Defendant

Lemonade, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John H. Eickemeyer

Attorney at Vedder Price P.C. (NY)

1633 Broadway, 31St Floor

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorney

David A. Luttinger, Jr

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP (NYC)

620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018-1405

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/25/2021) (ks) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#11

(#11) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Luttinger, Jr. dated October 25, 2021. Document filed by Lemonade, Inc...(Luttinger, David) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David A. Luttinger, Jr on behalf of Lemonade, Inc...(Luttinger, David) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#9

(#9) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lemonade, Inc...(pc) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#8

(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lemonade, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company, North American Capacity Insurance Company, Peleus Insurance Company..(Eickemeyer, John) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#3

#2

1 #6

Exhibit F - Policy

1 #5

Exhibit E - Swerdlow Complaint

1 #4

Exhibit D - Clarke Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit C - Citchens Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - Jones Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - Pruden Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Lemonade, Inc. answer due 12/20/2021. (ks) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/25/2021) (ks) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David A. Luttinger, Jr. dated October 25, 2021. Document filed by Lemonade, Inc...(Luttinger, David) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David A. Luttinger, Jr on behalf of Lemonade, Inc...(Luttinger, David) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lemonade, Inc...(pc) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-07070-JGK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lemonade, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company, North American Capacity Insurance Company, Peleus Insurance Company..(Eickemeyer, John) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John H. Eickemeyer to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John H. Eickemeyer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Argo Group International Holdings, Ltd. for Peleus Insurance Company. Document filed by Peleus Insurance Company..(Eickemeyer, John) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Swiss Re Ltd. for North American Capacity Insurance Company. Document filed by North American Capacity Insurance Company..(Eickemeyer, John) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Arch Capital Group Ltd. for Arch Specialty Insurance Company. Document filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company..(Eickemeyer, John) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of John H. Eickemeyer re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-07070. Document filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company, North American Capacity Insurance Company, Peleus Insurance Company..(Eickemeyer, John) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lemonade, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company, North American Capacity Insurance Company, Peleus Insurance Company..(Eickemeyer, John) Modified on 10/4/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Eickemeyer, John) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Lemonade, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25141622)Document filed by North American Capacity Insurance Company, Peleus Insurance Company, Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pruden Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Jones Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Citchens Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Clarke Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Swerdlow Complaint, #6 Exhibit F - Policy).(Eickemeyer, John) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lemonade, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Peleus Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Arch Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where North American Company for Life and Health Insurance is a litigant