This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 18:34:16 (UTC).

Nortey v. St. John Medical Center, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 Nortey filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against St John Medical Center, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James H Payne and Frank H McCarthy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00523

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James H Payne

Referral Judge

Frank H McCarthy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ruth A Nortey

Defendants

St. John Medical Center, Inc.

Ascenision St. John

Ascension St. John

Ascenision St. John doing business as St. John Health System, Inc.

Ascension St. John doing business as St. John Health Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frank W Frasier, III

Attorney at Frasier Frasier & Hickman

1700 Sw Blvd #100

Tulsa, OK 74107

Kathryn Black

Kathryn H Burgy

Attorney at Frasier Frasier & Hickman

1700 Sw Blvd #100

Tulsa, OK 74107

Defendant Attorney

Eva Camille Madison

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC (Fayetteville Ar)

217 E Dickson St Ste 204

Fayetteville, AR 72703

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#8

#9

#10

#11

#16

#17

#18

#19

#20

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support Thereof ) by Ruth A Nortey ; (Frasier, Frank) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Ascension St. John, St. John Medical Center, Inc. (Madison, Eva) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support Thereof by Ascension St. John, St. John Medical Center, Inc. (Madison, Eva) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 11/19/2019) (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent St. John Health System, Inc. for St. John Medical Center, Inc.; Corporate Parent Ascension Health for Ascension St. John) by Ascension St. John, St. John Medical Center, Inc. (Madison, Eva) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • (#15) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - dkt #7 was entered in error and is hereby vacated, vacating/setting aside order(s) (Re: 7 Minute Order,, Directing Attorney to File PHV Motion, ) (Documents Terminated: 7 Minute Order,, Directing Attorney to File PHV Motion, ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTE ORDER by Judge James H Payne : granting defendants' motion waiving local rule requirement ; granting #11 Motion for Relief (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MINUTE ORDER by Judge James H Payne : granting plaintiffs' motion until November 8, 2019 ; granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #8 Amended Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • (#12) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing St. John Medical Center, Inc. and Ascension St. John to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: filer selected in error; Correction: removed Ascenision St. John as a filer (Re: #11 MOTION for Relief from Local Counsel Requirement and Brief in Support Thereof ) (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Ascension St. John, St. John Medical Center, Inc. (Madison, Eva) Modified on 10/24/2019 to remove filer selected in error (sac, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Eva Camille Madison on behalf of Ascenision St. John, Ascension St. John, St. John Medical Center, Inc. [Note: Attorney Eva Camille Madison added to party Ascenision St. John(pty:dft), Attorney Eva Camille Madison added to party Ascension St. John(pty:dft), Attorney Eva Camille Madison added to party St. John Medical Center, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Madison, Eva) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ascenision St. John, St. John Medical Center, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Ruth A Nortey (Frasier, Frank) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Kathryn Black to file by 11/01/2019 a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice per Local Civil Rule 83.2. Additionally, if you intend to practice in this district in the future and want to become a member of this district, please submit an application for attorney admission. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (eaw, Dpty Clk) Modified on 11/1/2019 - VACATED per 15 (sac, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Frank W Frasier, III on behalf of Ruth A Nortey (Frasier, Frank) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Ascenision St. John, St. John Medical Center, Inc. (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kathryn Black on behalf of Ruth A Nortey (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FILING FEES Paid in Full by Ruth A Nortey (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ascenision St. John, St. John Medical Center, Inc. by Ruth A Nortey (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ruth A Nortey (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST. JOHNS MEDICAL CENTER, P.A., AS ASSIGNEE OF BRANDYN GONZALEZ is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank W Frasier, III