This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2020 at 07:51:30 (UTC).

Norsell et al v. Association of Apartment Owners of Coconut Plantation

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Norsell filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Association of Apartment Owners of Coconut Plantation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are HELEN GILLMOR, WES REBER PORTER and LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00018

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Referral Judge

WES REBER PORTER

Presiding Judges

HELEN GILLMOR

LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Johann Ramirez Rubalcava

Stuart Rynd Norsell

Defendant

Association of Apartment Owners of Coconut Plantation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael L. Iosua

Attorney at Imanaka Asato, LLLC

745 Fort St Mall 17Th Floor

Honolulu, HI 96813

Steven K.S. Chung

Attorney at Imanaka Asato, LLLC

745 Fort St Mall 17Th Floor, 521-9500, Fax: 541-9050

Honolulu, HI 96813

Timothy E. Ho

Attorney at Imanaka Asato, LLLC

745 Fort St Mall 17Th Floor

Honolulu, HI 96813

Defendant Attorney

Dan C. Oyasato

Attorney at Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC

888 Mililani St, 2Nd Floor, 523-0702, Fax: 538-1927

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#15

#13

12 #1

Certificate of Service Certificate of Service

#12

#10

#9

#8

#7

6 #2

Waiver of the Service of Summons

6 #1

Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons

#6

5 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement

#5

#3

#2

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 3/10/2020. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for March 30, 2020 is VACATED and will be reset after the stay is lifted. No later than May 1, 2020 the parties shall file a Joint Status Report with the Court regarding the status of Malabe v. AOAO of Executive Centre. ( Status Report due by 5/1/2020.) (emt, ) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) EO: Based on #13 , the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 03/09/2020 is CONTINUED to 3/30/2020 at 09:00AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Letter from Steven K.S. Chung and Timothy E. Ho addressed to Magistrate Judge Porter, dated March 3, 2020. (mrf) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiffs Stuart Rynd Norsell and Johann Ramirez Rubalcava's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docket(#11) EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 09:00 AM is CONTINUED to 09:15AM, the same day, in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stuart Rynd Norsell. Association of Apartment Owners of Coconut Plantation waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Association of Apartment Owners of Coconut Plantation re #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Oyasato, Dan) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Association of Apartment Owners of Coconut Plantation. (Oyasato, Dan) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/15/2020. Pursuant to Local Rule 40.2, this action is REASSIGNED from Senior United States District Judge Helen Gillmor to United States District Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi. Referral Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter remains assigned to this case. The case number shall change on all future filings in this case from Civ. No. 20-00018 HG-WRP to Civ. No. 20-00018 LEK-WRP . (jo) Modified on 1/22/2020 (emt, ). (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 3/9/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00018 HG-WRP on all further pleadings. (jo) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Stuart Rynd Norsell Notice of Related Cases Stuart Rynd Norsell. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Stuart Rynd Norsell. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against Association of Apartment Owners of Coconut Plantation, by and through Its Board of Directors ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2316547.), filed by Stuart Rynd Norsell.(Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dan C. Oyasato