This case was last updated from PACER on 06/27/2021 at 08:29:47 (UTC).

Norris et al v. Winnebago Industries, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 Norris filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Winnebago Industries, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is George C Hanks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01400

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C Hanks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Barbara Norris

Elizabeth Norris

Defendants

Camping World RV Sales, LLC

U.S. Bank National Association

Winnebago Industries, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Collins Dalton

Attorney at Attorney at Law

1343 W Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Defendant Attorney

Christopher Jon Lowman

Attorney at Attorney at Law

500 Dallas Street, Suite 3030

Houston, TX 77002-4705

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference reset for 9/15/2021 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Camping World RV Sales, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Winnebago Industries, Inc., filed.(Lowman, Christopher) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

3 #2

Continuation

3 #1

Continuation

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation)(DesireeSillas, 4) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

2 #2

Exhibit

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Plaintiffs, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Dalton, Richard) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26357444) filed by Barbara Norris, Elizabeth Norris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dalton, Richard) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference reset for 9/15/2021 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Camping World RV Sales, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Winnebago Industries, Inc., filed.(Lowman, Christopher) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation)(DesireeSillas, 4) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Plaintiffs, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Dalton, Richard) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26357444) filed by Barbara Norris, Elizabeth Norris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dalton, Richard) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Camping World RV Sales, LLC doing business as Camping World RV Sales - Jackson is a litigant

Latest cases where WINNEBAGO INDUSTRIES is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard C Dalton