This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/16/2020 at 09:01:01 (UTC).

Norred & Associates, Inc. v. ADP, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 Norred Associates, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ADP, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William M. Ray, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00239

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Ray, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Norred & Associates, Inc.

Defendant

ADP, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Hugh Hill

Attorney at Glover & Davis

P.O. Drawer 1038, 10 Brown Street

Newnan, GA 30264

Nathan Thomas Lee

Attorney at Glover & Davis

P.O. Drawer 1038, 10 Brown Street

Newnan, GA 30264

Defendant Attorneys

William S. Gyves

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren-NY

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

Kenneth G. Menendez

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP -Atl

Suite 1600, 100 Galleria Parkway

Atlanta, GA 30339-5948

 

Court Documents

10 #11

Text of Proposed Order

10 #10

Exhibit F to Morrison Declaration (Walker Status Report)

10 #9

Exhibit E to Morrison Declaration (Mercado Complaint)

10 #8

Exhibit D to Morrison Declaration (Walker PAGA Complaint)

10 #7

Exhibit C to Morrison Declaration (Walker Complaint)

10 #6

Exhibit B to Morrison Declaration (Lopez Complaint)

10 #5

Exhibit A to Morrison Declaration (Norred's Complaint)

10 #4

Affidavit Declaration of Randall L. Morrison, Jr.

10 #1

Brief Defendant ADP, LLC's Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Dismissal

4 #2

Text of Proposed Order Order Extending Time

4 #1

Affidavit Declaration of William S. Gyves

#4

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit -B

1 #1

Exhibit -A

#1

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (jpa) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Robert Ward re #17 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (ah) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Robert Ward as the requirements stated in LR 83.1B for admission pro hac vice have been satisfied. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 3/11/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert Ward Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Robert N. Ward added appearing on behalf of ADP, Inc. (nmb) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY Brief re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ADP, Inc. (Gyves, William) Modified to edit text on 3/11/2020 (ah). (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) APPLICATION for Admission of Robert Ward Pro Hac Vice.by ADP, Inc.. (Menendez, Kenneth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN of #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert Ward Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9432836) to attorney for correction. (cdg) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPLICATION for Admission of Robert Ward Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9432836).by ADP, Inc.. (Menendez, Kenneth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Brief in Support filed by Norred & Associates, Inc.. (Lee, Nathan) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 2/18/20. (rlb) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Randall L. Morrison, Jr. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/31/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #2 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for William S. Gyves. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/31/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Randall L. Morrison, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9294723).. Attorney Randall L. Morrison, Jr. added appearing on behalf of ADP, Inc. (pmb) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #2 APPLICATION for Admission of William S. Gyves Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9294704).. Attorney William S. Gyves added appearing on behalf of ADP, Inc. (pmb) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/30/20. (rlb) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, ADP, Inc. Answer due 2/17/2020. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/23/20. (rlb) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by ADP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of William S. Gyves, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Extending Time)(Menendez, Kenneth) Modified on 1/23/2020 to edit text (rlb). (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION for Admission of Randall L. Morrison, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9294723).by ADP, Inc.. (Menendez, Kenneth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION for Admission of William S. Gyves Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9294704).by ADP, Inc.. (Menendez, Kenneth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by ADP, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9271983) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less