This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2019 at 08:02:07 (UTC).

Norment v. Foundation Building Materials, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2019 Norment filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Foundation Building Materials, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Russell G. Vineyard and Timothy C. Batten, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04048

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Russell G. Vineyard

Presiding Judge

Timothy C. Batten, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lonetta Norment

Defendants, Counter Defendants and Counter Claimants

Keith Artlett

Foundation Building Materials, LLC

Specialty Products and Insulation Company

Specialty Products and Insulation, LLC

Keith Artelt

SPI, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward D. Buckley

Attorney at Buckley Beal, LLP

Suite 3900, 600 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308

Defendant, Counter Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Deepa N. Subramanian

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Atl

Suite 4800, 191 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303

Louisa J. Johnson

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw-Atlanta

Suite 2500, 1075 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Benjamin Ian Han

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP - Atlanta

Bank Of America Plaza, Suite 4100, 600 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308-2216

Alex S. Drummond

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw-Atlanta

Suite 2500, 1075 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) Certificate of Interested Persons by Lonetta Norment. (Buckley, Edward) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#23

(#23) Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 10/25/2019. (usw) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#22

(#22) Return of Service Executed by Lonetta Norment. SPI, LLC served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Buckley, Edward) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Alex S. Drummond on behalf of Keith Artelt, SPI, LLC (Drummond, Alex) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#20

(#20) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keith Artelt, SPI, LLC, Specialty Products and Insulation, LLC identifying Corporate Parent SPI Intermediate LLC for SPI, LLC. (Johnson, Louisa) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

19 #2

Exhibit B

19 #1

Exhibit A

#19

(#19) ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint and Counterclaims Against Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Johnson, Louisa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 10/23/2019 to correct counterclaim language (rsh). (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#14

(#19) ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint and Counterclaims Against Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Johnson, Louisa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 10/23/2019 to correct counterclaim language (rsh). (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#5

(#5) Return of Service Executed by Lonetta Norment. Specialty Products and Insulation, LLC served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Buckley, Edward) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#4

(#4) Return of Service Executed by Lonetta Norment. Foundation Building Materials, LLC served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Buckley, Edward) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#3

(#3) Return of Service Executed by Lonetta Norment. Keith Artelt served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Buckley, Edward) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

2 #3

Summons

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Keith Artlett, Foundation Building Materials, LLC, Specialty Products and Insulation Company, and Specialty Products and Insulation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (jed) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings re: #1 Complaint, by Keith Artelt, Specialty Products and Insulation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Louisa) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #24 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Certificate of Interested Persons by Lonetta Norment. (Buckley, Edward) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 10/25/2019. (usw) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Return of Service Executed by Lonetta Norment. SPI, LLC served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Buckley, Edward) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Alex S. Drummond on behalf of Keith Artelt, SPI, LLC (Drummond, Alex) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #20 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keith Artelt, SPI, LLC, Specialty Products and Insulation, LLC identifying Corporate Parent SPI Intermediate LLC for SPI, LLC. (Johnson, Louisa) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint and Counterclaims Against Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Johnson, Louisa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 10/23/2019 to correct counterclaim language (rsh). (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #18 Corporate Disclosure Statement: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foundation Building Materials, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Foundation Building Materials Holding Company LLC (f/k/a FBM Beta LLC and LSF9 Cypress Holdings LLC (DE) ("Holdco"), Other Affiliate FBM Alpha LLC ("Alpha"), Other Affiliate Foundation Building Materials, Inc. for Foundation Building Materials, LLC by Foundation Building Materials, LLC.(Subramanian, Deepa) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GRANTING Foundation Building Materials LLC's #7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Foundation Building Materials, LLC Answer due 10/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 10/02/2019. (usw) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER GRANTING #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants Specialty Products and Insulation, LLC and Artelt to File Responsive Pleadings. The time for Defendants Specialty Products and Insulation, LLC and Artelt to file responsive pleadings shall be extended to and include 10/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 10/02/2019. (usw) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings re: #1 Complaint, by Keith Artelt, Specialty Products and Insulation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Louisa) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Foundation Building Materials, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Subramanian, Deepa) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Return of Service Executed by Lonetta Norment. Specialty Products and Insulation Company served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Buckley, Edward) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Return of Service Executed by Lonetta Norment. Specialty Products and Insulation, LLC served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Buckley, Edward) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Return of Service Executed by Lonetta Norment. Foundation Building Materials, LLC served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Buckley, Edward) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Return of Service Executed by Lonetta Norment. Keith Artelt served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Buckley, Edward) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Keith Artlett, Foundation Building Materials, LLC, Specialty Products and Insulation Company, and Specialty Products and Insulation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (jed) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lonetta Norment. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8921001) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used- forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less