This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/11/2022 at 08:36:33 (UTC).

Norman Maurice Rowe, MD, MHA, LLC et al v. Oxford Health Insurance Co., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 Norman Maurice Rowe, MD, MHA, LLC filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Oxford Health Insurance Co , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rachel P. Kovner and Roanne L. Mann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00770

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rachel P. Kovner

Referral Judge

Roanne L. Mann

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Norman Maurice Rowe, MD, MHA, LLC

East Coast Plastic Surgery, P.C.

Defendants

Oxford Health Plans LLC

Oxford Health Insurance Co., Inc.

Oxford Health Insurance, Inc.

Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc.

Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Baglio

Attorney at Lewin & Baglio, LLP.

1100 Shames Drive, Suite 100

Westbury, NY 11590

Brendan J Kearns

Attorney at Lewin & Balgio, LLP

1100 Shames Dr

Westbury, NY 11590

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Paul Mazzola

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP

666 Third Ave, Ste 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Michael H. Bernstein

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP

Chrysler East Building, 666 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A-State Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B-State Docket

1 #3

Exhibit C-Public records Filing

1 #4

Exhibit D-Comprehensive Report

1 #5

Exhibit E-Summary of Plan

1 #6

Exhibit F-Letter, dated December 24, 2018

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oxford Health Insurance Co., Inc., Oxford Health Insurance, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Paul Mazzola on behalf of Oxford Health Insurance Co., Inc., Oxford Health Insurance, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Oxford Health Plans LLC (aty to be noticed) (Mazzola, Matthew) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#6

(#6) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, Request for an extension of time to respond to the Complaint by Oxford Health Insurance Co., Inc., Oxford Health Insurance, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Oxford Health Plans LLC. (Mazzola, Matthew) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#7

(#7) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference in connection with Defendants' anticipated Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by Oxford Health Insurance Co., Inc., Oxford Health Insurance, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Oxford Health Plans LLC. (Mazzola, Matthew) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan J Kearns on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Kearns, Brendan) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference in connection with Defendants' anticipated Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kearns, Brendan) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: The motion for a pre-motion conference at #7 is denied because the Court has determined that a pre-motion conference is unnecessary. Per the Court's bundling rule, defendants shall serve their motion on plaintiffs by 4/21/2022 (but the motion shall not be filed on the docket at that time). See Judge Kovner's Individual Rules IV.B. Plaintiffs may serve a response on defendants by 5/23/2022 (but the response shall not be filed on the docket at that time). Defendants may serve a reply on plaintiffs, if any, by 6/7/2022. The parties shall file all the documents associated with the fully-briefed motion with the Court by 6/7/2022. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 3/19/2022. (Daus, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference in connection with Defendants' anticipated Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kearns, Brendan) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan J Kearns on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Kearns, Brendan) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER: Per Individual Rule IV.A, plaintiff shall file a response to defendants' motion for a pre-motion conference #7 within five business days. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 3/10/2022. (Daus, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference in connection with Defendants' anticipated Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by Oxford Health Insurance Co., Inc., Oxford Health Insurance, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Oxford Health Plans LLC. (Mazzola, Matthew) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER Application granted, on consent. #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Request for an extension of time to respond to the Complaint, All Defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/3/2022. (LK) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, Request for an extension of time to respond to the Complaint by Oxford Health Insurance Co., Inc., Oxford Health Insurance, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Oxford Health Plans LLC. (Mazzola, Matthew) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Paul Mazzola on behalf of Oxford Health Insurance Co., Inc., Oxford Health Insurance, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Oxford Health Plans LLC (aty to be noticed) (Mazzola, Matthew) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketThis case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oxford Health Insurance Co., Inc., Oxford Health Insurance, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Oxford Health Insurance Co., Inc., Oxford Health Insurance, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NJ), Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York-Queens County, case number Index No. 700254/2022. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-15281224) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-State Docket, #3 Exhibit C-Public records Filing, #4 Exhibit D-Comprehensive Report, #5 Exhibit E-Summary of Plan, #6 Exhibit F-Letter, dated December 24, 2018, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Norman Maurice Rowen, MD, MHA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where East Coast Plastic Surgery, PC is a litigant

Latest cases where Oxford Health Plans, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Oxford Health Insurance Inc is a litigant