This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2019 at 07:55:23 (UTC).

Noriega v. Loews Hotels Holding Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 Noriega filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Loews Hotels Holding Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gonzalo P. Curiel and Nita L. Stormes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00068

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gonzalo P. Curiel

Referral Judge

Nita L. Stormes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alicia Noriega

Defendants

Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation

DOES 1 through 50

Loews Hotels Holding Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frank Gerald Chica

135 South Jackson Street, Suite 203

Glendale, CA 91205

Susana Oganesian

135 S. Jackson Street, Suite 203

Glendale, CA 91203

Defendant Attorneys

Ferry Eden Bagona Lopez

Attorney at HIRSCHFELD KRAEMER LLP

233 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 600

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Kirstin E. Muller

Attorney at Hirschfeld Kraemer LLP

233 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 600

Santa Monica, CA 90401

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal - including State Court Complaint

1 #3

Declaration Sean Clancy

1 #4

Declaration Ferry Lopez

1 #5

Exhibit A to Lopez Declaration Settlement Demand

1 #6

Exhibit B to Lopez Declaration

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Declaration Declaration of Susana Oganesian, Esq.

4 #2

Proposed Order

#5

#6

#7

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed : Any opposition to the motion shall be filed on or before April 26, 2019. Any reply is due on or before May 10, 2019. A hearing for the motion originally scheduled for April 5, 2019 shall be rescheduled to May 24, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/14/19.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Kirstin E. Muller on behalf of Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation, Loews Hotels Holding Corporation (Muller, Kirstin)Attorney Kirstin E. Muller added to party Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Kirstin E. Muller added to party Loews Hotels Holding Corporation(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alicia Noriega. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Oganesian, Susana) (dlg). (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Alicia Noriega. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Susana Oganesian, Esq., #2 Proposed Order)(Oganesian, Susana)Attorney Susana Oganesian added to party Alicia Noriega(pty:pla) qc email re proposed order (dlg). (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation, Loews Hotels Holding Corporation. No Parties With Financial Interest. (mme) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation, Loews Hotels Holding Corporation. (mme) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of CA, San Diego, case number 37-2018-00044065-CU-OE-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12078500.), filed by Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal - including State Court Complaint, #3 Declaration Sean Clancy, #4 Declaration Ferry Lopez, #5 Exhibit A to Lopez Declaration Settlement Demand, #6 Exhibit B to Lopez Declaration)The new case number is 3:19-cv-68-GPC-NLS. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case.(mme) (sjt). (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Loews Coronado Hotel Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Loew's Hotels, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Susana Oganesian, NCAED