This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2021 at 13:32:20 (UTC).

Norfleet v. CBS Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Norfleet filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against CBS Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah S. Vance and Janis van Meerveld. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00759

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah S. Vance

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Norfleet

Defendants, Cross Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Foster Wheeler LLC

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

CBS Corporation

Maryland Casualty Company

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

General Electric Company

OneBeacon America Insurance Company

McCarty Corporation

Zurich American Insurance Company

Cross Claimant, Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Foster Wheeler LLC

CBS Corporation

Maryland Casualty Company

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

General Electric Company

Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust

McCarty Corporation

Zurich American Insurance Company

3Rd Party Defendant and Cross Defendant

Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust

30 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Damon R. Pourciau

Attorney at Pourciau Law Firm, LLC

8550 United Plaza Blvd., Suite 702

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Defendant, Cross Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Angela M. Bowlin

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Lacey Taylor McCoy

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Kelsey A. Eagan

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael Scott Minyard

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Timothy Farrow Daniels

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Edward Winter Trapolin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Douglas Watson Redfearn

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Louis Oliver Oubre

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Lee M. LeBouef

Attorney at Leake & Andersson, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 1700

New Orleans, LA 70163-1701

Defendant, Cross Claimant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael Scott Minyard

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Timothy Farrow Daniels

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Edward Winter Trapolin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Angela M. Bowlin

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Lacey Taylor McCoy

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Kelsey A. Eagan

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Douglas Watson Redfearn

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Louis Oliver Oubre

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Lee M. LeBouef

Attorney at Leake & Andersson, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 1700

New Orleans, LA 70163-1701

April Ann McQuillar

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Other Attorneys

Amber L. Stewart

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201

Samuel Milton Rosamond, III

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe APLC

1515 Poydras St., Ste 1900

New Orleans, LA 70112

Jeffrey Matthew Burg,

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Brittney Bullock Ankersen

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jeffrey Matthew Burg

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Milele N. St. Julien

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Mary Reeves Arthur

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

23 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#31

#30

#29

#27

#26

25 #1

Proposed Order

#25

#24

#21

6 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

#6

#4

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Eagle Inc (Redfearn, Douglas) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McCarty Corporation (Redfearn, Douglas) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Proposed Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Peth, Connor)(Filed per order at rec. doc. 16) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #27 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney should have entered the Corporate Parents at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Statement of Corporate Disclosure identifying Corporate Parents Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, Zurich Insurance Group Ltd for Zurich American Insurance Company by Zurich American Insurance Company (Devenport, Marc) Modified text/added corporate parents on 6/2/2021 (mm). (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting #25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Thomas Whelen terminated. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/1/2021. (cwa) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Christopher T. Whelen as Attorney by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Joinder Re: Lamorak Insurance Company's Motion to Enforce Stay and Notice of Liquidation and Statutory Stay (R. Doc. 18). Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/24/2021. (mm) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM of No Opposition filed by James Norfleet re #21 MOTION for Joinder Re: Lamorak Insurance Company's Motion to Enforce Stay and Notice of Liquidation and Statutory Stay (R. Doc. 18), #18 MOTION to Enforce Stay and Notice of Liquidation and Statutory Stay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pourciau, Damon) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers Inc (Bell, Troy) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Melancon, David) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION to Withdraw Charles Valles as Attorney. **Motion filed in error. Attorney asking to be withdrawn is not enrolled in the case AND is not even admitted to this Court. No further action is needed.** (mm) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Charles Valles as Attorney by James Norfleet. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pourciau, Damon) Modified text on 4/19/2021 (mm). Reopened motion on 5/4/2021 (mp). (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. Exhibits on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed. (bm) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. By the Clerk. (bm) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISREGARD; See Doc. 5. Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Exhibits. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (bm) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (aj) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 2020-8599 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8817357) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft)(Melancon, David) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/15/2021) (bm). (Attachment 3 replaced on 4/15/2021) (bm). Modified text on 4/15/2021 (bm). (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Maryland Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where McCarty Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. is a litigant