This case was last updated from PACER on 08/01/2021 at 09:36:54 (UTC).

Nordlund v. Beesley et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 Nordlund filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Beesley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sharon L. Gleason and Ralph R. Beistline. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00134

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sharon L. Gleason

Ralph R. Beistline

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Christopher Nordlund

Wasilla, AK 99623

Defendants

Tigner

Beesley

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Christopher Nordlund. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Consideration/Clarification by David Christopher Nordlund.(JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by David Christopher Nordlund (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER REGARDING STATUS OF STATE COURT CASES: Notice to the Court or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal due 7/30/2021. The Application to Waiver Prepayment of Filing Fee, at Docket #3 , is DEFERRED. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 6/29/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

3 #1

Account Statement

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Christopher Nordlund. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

1 #1

1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Beesley, Tigner, filed by David Christopher Nordlund. (Attachments: #1 1)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RRB TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal at #8 is accepted. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), the Court dismisses the case without prejudice.(SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Christopher Nordlund. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Consideration/Clarification by David Christopher Nordlund.(JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by David Christopher Nordlund (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REGARDING STATUS OF STATE COURT CASES: Notice to the Court or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal due 7/30/2021. The Application to Waiver Prepayment of Filing Fee, at Docket #3 , is DEFERRED. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 6/29/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docket(#4) SLG TEXT ORDER: By agreement of the judges, the above referenced case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Ralph R. Beistline for all further proceedings. Henceforth, parties to use the following case caption for all future filings in 3:21-cv-00134-RRB. (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Christopher Nordlund. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Beesley, Tigner, filed by David Christopher Nordlund. (Attachments: #1 1)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less