This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/26/2023 at 08:13:02 (UTC).

NORDBECK v. CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, a/k/a CREDIT CONTROL SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2022 NORDBECK filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, a/k/a CREDIT CONTROL SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02473

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUSTIN NORDBECK

Defendant

CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, a/k/a CREDIT CONTROL SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Thomas Steinkamp

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, a/k/a CREDIT CONTROL SERVICES, INC., filed by JUSTIN NORDBECK. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7430173) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2- The January 10, 2022 Dispute Letter sent to Defendant, #3 Exhibit 3- Plaintiff's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 4- The March 18, 2022 "Failure To Dispute" letter sent to Defendant, #5 Exhibit 3- Relevant Pages of Plaintiff's March 15, 2022 Experian Credit Report, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit 1- Debt Collector License Information

1 #2

Exhibit 2- The January 10, 2022 Dispute Letter sent to Defendant

1 #3

Exhibit 3- Plaintiff's Affidavit

1 #4

Exhibit 4- The March 18, 2022 "Failure To Dispute" letter sent to Defe

1 #5

Exhibit 3- Relevant Pages of Plaintiff's March 15, 2022 Experian Credit Rep

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff JUSTIN NORDBECK. (Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, a/k/a CREDIT CONTROL SERVICES, INC. (DJH) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (DJH) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service, filed by JUSTIN NORDBECK. CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, a/k/a CREDIT CONTROL SERVICES, INC. served on 1/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

6 #1

Affidavit

#7

(#7) ORDER - The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are VACATED. IT IS ORDERED that within thirty days of this date, counsel for the parties shall file a motion to dismiss this cause or a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/6/2023.(SWM) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER - The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are VACATED. IT IS ORDERED that within thirty days of this date, counsel for the parties shall file a motion to dismiss this cause or a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/6/2023.(SWM) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service, filed by JUSTIN NORDBECK. CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, a/k/a CREDIT CONTROL SERVICES, INC. served on 1/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (DJH) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, a/k/a CREDIT CONTROL SERVICES, INC. (DJH) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff JUSTIN NORDBECK. (Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES, a/k/a CREDIT CONTROL SERVICES, INC., filed by JUSTIN NORDBECK. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7430173) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2- The January 10, 2022 Dispute Letter sent to Defendant, #3 Exhibit 3- Plaintiff's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 4- The March 18, 2022 "Failure To Dispute" letter sent to Defendant, #5 Exhibit 3- Relevant Pages of Plaintiff's March 15, 2022 Experian Credit Report, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less