This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/01/2021 at 10:01:56 (UTC).

Norcom v. Novant Health, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 Norcom filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Novant Health, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Graham Mullen, David Keesler and Robert J. Conrad, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00673

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David Keesler

Presiding Judges

Graham Mullen

Robert J. Conrad, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patricia Norcom

Defendant

Novant Health, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Philip J. Gibbons, Jr

Attorney at Gibbons Leis, PLLC

14045 Ballantyne Corporate Place, Ste. 325

Charlotte, NC 28277

Craig Lorne Leis

Attorney at Gibbons Leis, PLLC

14045 Ballantyne Corporate Place, Ste. 325

Charlotte, NC 28277

Corey Michael Stanton

Attorney at Gibbons Leis, PLLC

14045 Ballantyne Corporate Place, Suite 325

Charlotte, NC 28277

Defendant Attorneys

Margaret Santen Hanrahan

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

201 South College Street, Suite 2300

Charlotte, NC 28244

Benjamin Robert Holland

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC

201 South College Street, Suite 2300

Charlotte, NC 28244

Michael D. Ray

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

201 South College Street, Suite 2300

Charlotte, NC 28244

Bryn Dodge Wilson

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart

Suite 2300, 201 S. College St.

Charlotte, NC 28244

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Proposed Order

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Patricia Norcom. (Leis, Craig) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Novant Health, Inc.. Replies due by 1/26/2021 (Ray, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Novant Health, Inc..(Ray, Michael) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Patricia Norcom. (Leis, Craig) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Patricia Norcom. Responses due by 1/19/2021 (Leis, Craig). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant Novant Health, Inc. shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before January 9, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/8/20. (mga) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Novant Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Holland, Benjamin). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Bryn Dodge Wilson on behalf of Novant Health, Inc. (Wilson, Bryn) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Novant Health, Inc. (Holland, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg, case number 20-cvs-14738. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4788345), filed by Novant Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Holland, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOVANT HEALTH, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael D. Ray

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARGARET S. HANRAHAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENJAMIN R. HOLLAND