This case was last updated from PACER on 08/31/2020 at 11:00:53 (UTC).

NORA'S STYLE SALON INC v. FARMER'S GROUP, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 NORA'S STYLE SALON INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FARMER'S GROUP, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Darrin P. Gayles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-22751

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Darrin P. Gayles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORA'S STYLE SALON INC

Defendants

TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE

FARMER'S GROUP, INC.

FARMER'S GROUP, INC. doing business as FARMERS UNDERWRITERS ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam M. Moskowitz

Attorney at The Moskowitz Law Firm, PLLC

2 Alhambra Plaza, Suite 601

Coral Gables, FL 33134-6036

Shane Salvage Smith

Attorney at Merlin Law Group, P.A.

777 S. Harbour Island Blvd., Suite 950

Tampa, FL 33602

Joseph M. Kaye

Attorney at The Moskowitz Law Firm, PLLC

2 Alhambra Plaza, Suite 601

Miami, FL 33134

Adam Abraham Schwartzbaum

Attorney at The Moskowitz Law Firm

2 Alhambra Plaza, Suite 601, Coral Gables

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Howard Mitchell Bushman

Attorney at The Moskowitz Law Firm, PLLC

2 Alhambra Plaza, Suite 601

Coral Gables, FL 33134

William F. Merlin, Jr.

Attorney at Merlin Law Group PA

777 S Harbour Island Boulevard, Suite 950

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

Allen Paige Pegg

Attorney at Hogan Lovells LLP

600 Brickell Avenue, 27Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131

Joshua Thaddeus Fordin

Attorney at Fisher Potter Hodas

515 No. Flagler Dr., Ste. 800

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Jasmeet K. Ahuja

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

1735 Market Street, Floor 23

Philadelphia,, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice

12 #1

Certification Certification of Jasmeet K. Ahuja

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jasmeet K. Ahuja. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13285901 by FARMER'S GROUP, INC., TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE. Responses due by 8/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Jasmeet K. Ahuja, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Pegg, Allen) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Thaddeus Fordin on behalf of FARMER'S GROUP, INC., TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE. Attorney Joshua Thaddeus Fordin added to party FARMER'S GROUP, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Thaddeus Fordin added to party TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE(pty:dft). (Fordin, Joshua) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE. TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Pegg, Allen) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FARMER'S GROUP, INC.. FARMER'S GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Pegg, Allen) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Paige Pegg on behalf of FARMER'S GROUP, INC., TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE. Attorney Allen Paige Pegg added to party FARMER'S GROUP, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Allen Paige Pegg added to party TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE(pty:dft). (Pegg, Allen) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

6 #1

Summon(s)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to FARMER'S GROUP, INC., TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ail) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

5 #2

Summon(s)

5 #1

Summon(s)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by NORA'S STYLE SALON INC (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Moskowitz, Adam) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Striking #3 Summons Issued by NORA'S STYLE SALON INC (Moskowitz, Adam) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to FARMER'S GROUP, INC., TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (amb) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against FARMER'S GROUP, INC., TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13123252, filed by NORA'S STYLE SALON INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Exhibit A)(Moskowitz, Adam) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Jasmeet K. Ahuja may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Defendants, Farmer's Group, Inc. d/b/a Farmers Underwriters Association and Truck Insurance Exchange. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Jasmeet K. Ahuja at jasmeet.ahuja@hoganlovells.com Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jasmeet K. Ahuja. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13285901 by FARMER'S GROUP, INC., TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE. Responses due by 8/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Jasmeet K. Ahuja, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Pegg, Allen) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Thaddeus Fordin on behalf of FARMER'S GROUP, INC., TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE. Attorney Joshua Thaddeus Fordin added to party FARMER'S GROUP, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Thaddeus Fordin added to party TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE(pty:dft). (Fordin, Joshua) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE. TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Pegg, Allen) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FARMER'S GROUP, INC.. FARMER'S GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Pegg, Allen) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Paige Pegg on behalf of FARMER'S GROUP, INC., TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE. Attorney Allen Paige Pegg added to party FARMER'S GROUP, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Allen Paige Pegg added to party TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE(pty:dft). (Pegg, Allen) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to FARMER'S GROUP, INC., TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ail) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by NORA'S STYLE SALON INC (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Moskowitz, Adam) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Striking #3 Summons Issued by NORA'S STYLE SALON INC (Moskowitz, Adam) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to FARMER'S GROUP, INC., TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (amb) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against FARMER'S GROUP, INC., TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13123252, filed by NORA'S STYLE SALON INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Exhibit A)(Moskowitz, Adam) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FARMERS GROUP INC DBA FARMERS UNDERWRITERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Truck Insurance Exchange is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASMEET K. AHUJA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allen Paige Pegg