This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/30/2022 at 08:39:17 (UTC).

Noramco LLC v. Dishman USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 Noramco LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Dishman USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01696

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noramco LLC

Defendant

Dishman USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frederick Brian Rosner

Attorney at The Rosner Law Group LLC

824 Market Street, Suite 810

Wilmington, DE 19801

Zhao Liu

Attorney at Rosner Law Group, LLC

824 N. Market Street, Ste 810

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Noramco US Holdings, Inc. for Noramco LLC filed by Noramco LLC. (Liu, Zhao) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

12 #3

Certificate of Service

12 #2

Cover Letter

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Noramco LLC- filed by Noramco LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Certificate of Service)(Liu, Zhao) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#11

(#11) REDACTED VERSION of #7 Opening Brief in Support, by Dishman USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Haoying Zhu - filed by Noramco LLC. (Liu, Zhao) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew J. Bayne - filed by Noramco LLC. (Liu, Zhao) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#8

(#8) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Dishman Carbogen Amcis Limited for Dishman USA, Inc. filed by Dishman USA, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Dishman USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 14, 2022 - filed by Dishman USA, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noramco LLC. Noramco LLC served on 12/1/2021, answer due 12/22/2021. (Liu, Zhao) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Dishman USA, Inc. on 12/1/2021. (srs) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Dishman USA, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3753664.) - filed by Noramco LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Noramco US Holdings, Inc. for Noramco LLC filed by Noramco LLC. (Liu, Zhao) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Noramco LLC- filed by Noramco LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Certificate of Service)(Liu, Zhao) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REDACTED VERSION of #7 Opening Brief in Support, by Dishman USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew J. Bayne filed by Noramco LLC, #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Haoying Zhu filed by Noramco LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/14/22. (ntl) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Haoying Zhu - filed by Noramco LLC. (Liu, Zhao) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew J. Bayne - filed by Noramco LLC. (Liu, Zhao) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Dishman Carbogen Amcis Limited for Dishman USA, Inc. filed by Dishman USA, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dishman USA, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Dishman USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 14, 2022 filed by Dishman USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/8/21. (ntl) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 14, 2022 - filed by Dishman USA, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noramco LLC. Noramco LLC served on 12/1/2021, answer due 12/22/2021. (Liu, Zhao) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Dishman USA, Inc. on 12/1/2021. (srs) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Dishman USA, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3753664.) - filed by Noramco LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Noramco Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stamatios Stamoulis