Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/30/2020 at 09:30:27 (UTC).

Nomad Global Communications Solutions, Inc. v. Hoseline, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 Nomad Global Communications Solutions, Inc filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Hoseline, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dana L. Christensen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-00138

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dana L. Christensen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nomad Global Communications Solutions, Inc.

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

Hoseline, Inc.

3Rd Party Defendant

Tutco, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jory C. Ruggiero

Attorney at WESTERN JUSTICE ASSOCIATES

303 West Mendenhall, Suite 1

Bozeman, MT 59715

Domenic A. Cossi

Attorney at WESTERN JUSTICE ASSOCIATES

303 West Mendenhall, Suite 1

Bozeman, MT 59715

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

Philip B. Condra

Attorney at MILODRAGOVICH DALE STEINBRENNER

620 High Park Way, Po Box 4947

Missoula, MT 59806-4947

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

John E. Bohyer

Attorney at BOHYER, ERICKSON, BEAUDETTE & TRANEL, P.C.

283 West Front Street, Suite 201, Po Box 7729

Missoula, MT 59807

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 12/10/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 12/10/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 12/10/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 02:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/19/2020. (ASG) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #5 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint by Tutco, Inc.. (Bohyer, John) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial, Hoseline Inc.'s Answer to Amended Complaint and Third-Party Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, and Summons on Third-Party served on Samantha Sutton as Registered Agent of CT Corporation System for Tutco, Inc. on 09/14/2020, filed by Hoseline, Inc.. (Condra, Philip) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Tutco, Inc. Summons may be downloaded and printed by Third Party Plaintiff's Counsel for service. (NOS) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

5 #1

Proposed 3rd Party Summons

#5

(#5) Hoseline, Inc.'s ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint Hoseline, Inc.'s, First THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Tutco, Inc. by Hoseline, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 3rd Party Summons) (Condra, Philip) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Nomad Global Communications Solutions, Inc. in state court on 8/5/2020. (ASG) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

3 #8

Doc 9

3 #7

Doc 8

3 #6

Doc 7

3 #5

Doc 6

3 #4

Doc 5

3 #3

Doc 4

3 #2

Doc 2

3 #1

Doc 1

#3

(#3) NOTICE of receipt of state court file via file sharing program. (Attachments: #1 Doc 1, #2 Doc 2, #3 Doc 4, #4 Doc 5, #5 Doc 6, #6 Doc 7, #7 Doc 8, #8 Doc 9) (ASG) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hoseline, Inc. (TAG) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hoseline, Inc. from Montana Eleventh Judicial District Court, Flathead County, case number DV 20-674. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 12/10/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 12/10/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 12/10/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 02:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/19/2020. (ASG) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #5 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint by Tutco, Inc.. (Bohyer, John) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial, Hoseline Inc.'s Answer to Amended Complaint and Third-Party Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, and Summons on Third-Party served on Samantha Sutton as Registered Agent of CT Corporation System for Tutco, Inc. on 09/14/2020, filed by Hoseline, Inc.. (Condra, Philip) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Tutco, Inc. Summons may be downloaded and printed by Third Party Plaintiff's Counsel for service. (NOS) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Hoseline, Inc.'s ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint Hoseline, Inc.'s, First THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Tutco, Inc. by Hoseline, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 3rd Party Summons) (Condra, Philip) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Nomad Global Communications Solutions, Inc. in state court on 8/5/2020. (ASG) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of receipt of state court file via file sharing program. (Attachments: #1 Doc 1, #2 Doc 2, #3 Doc 4, #4 Doc 5, #5 Doc 6, #6 Doc 7, #7 Doc 8, #8 Doc 9) (ASG) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hoseline, Inc. (TAG) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2535278 (TAG) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hoseline, Inc. from Montana Eleventh Judicial District Court, Flathead County, case number DV 20-674. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tutco LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John E. Bohyer