This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2021 at 09:56:25 (UTC).

Nollett v. BNSF Railway Company

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Nollett filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against BNSF Railway Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is N. Reid Neureiter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01005

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

N. Reid Neureiter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jackie Nollett

Defendant

BNSF Railway Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James E. Fitzgerald

Attorney at Fitzgerald Law Firm

2108 Warren Avenue

Cheyenne, WY 82001

Randal W. LeNeave

Attorney at Hunegs LeNeave & Kvas, P.A.

1000 Twelve Oaks Center Drive, Suite 101

Wayzata, MN 55391

Michael James Fitzgerald

Attorney at Fitzgerald Law Firm

2108 Warren Avenue

Cheyenne, WY 82001

Paul Anthony Banker

Attorney at Hunegs LeNeave & Kvas, P.A.

1000 Twelve Oaks Center Drive, Suite 101

Wayzata, MN 55391

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Puschel Reitman

Attorney at Hall & Evans LLC-Denver

1001 Seventeenth Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

Brian John Urankar

Attorney at Hall & Evans LLC-Denver

1001 Seventeenth Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#5

5 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jackie Nollett. (Banker, Paul) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION as to Remote Deposition Procedures by Plaintiff Jackie Nollett. (Banker, Paul) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian John Urankar on behalf of BNSF Railway CompanyAttorney Brian John Urankar added to party BNSF Railway Company(pty:dft) (Urankar, Brian) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Reitman, Andrew) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Defendant BNSF Railway Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Jury Demand Attorney Andrew Puschel Reitman added to party BNSF Railway Company(pty:dft) by BNSF Railway Company.(Reitman, Andrew) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Anthony Banker on behalf of Jackie NollettAttorney Paul Anthony Banker added to party Jackie Nollett(pty:pla) (Banker, Paul) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Randal W. LeNeave on behalf of Jackie NollettAttorney Randal W. LeNeave added to party Jackie Nollett(pty:pla) (LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackie Nollett. BNSF Railway Company served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Fitzgerald, James) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael James Fitzgerald on behalf of Jackie NollettAttorney Michael James Fitzgerald added to party Jackie Nollett(pty:pla) (Fitzgerald, Michael) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/13/2021. Consent/Non-Consent Form due by 6/16/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 6/30/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (slibi, ) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint filed by attorney James E. Fitzgerald.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (alave, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS REQUEST as to BNSF Railway Company by Plaintiff Jackie Nollett. (Fitzgerald, James) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BNSF Railway Company (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7809528)Attorney James E. Fitzgerald added to party Jackie Nollett(pty:pla), filed by Jackie Nollett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fitzgerald, James) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BNSF Railway Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Puschel Reitman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian John Urankar