This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2022 at 07:03:26 (UTC).

Guadalupe Nolasco et al v. Bellflower Unified School District

Case Summary

On 12/15/2021 Guadalupe Nolasco filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Bellflower Unified School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark C. Scarsi and Margo A. Rocconi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09708

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

Referral Judge

Margo A. Rocconi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Guadalupe Nolasco

Jose de Jesus Bejarano

Defendant

Bellflower Unified School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexis Victoria Casillas

Steven James Catron

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. For future filings, please note that the Summons Request should be a separate entry on the docket using the event: Service Documents > Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaint > Summons Request. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#5

(#5) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Bellflower Unified School District. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jose de Jesus Bejarano, Guadalupe Nolasco, (Catron, Steven) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#7

(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (vv) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Guadalupe Nolasco, Jose de Jesus Bejarano. upon Bellflower Unified School District waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/4/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Richard D. Brady. (Catron, Steven) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#9

(#9) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiffs Jose de Jesus Bejarano, Guadalupe Nolasco. Exhibit A : Administrative Decision as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Casillas, Alexis) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit (non-trial) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. Page 1 is blank with "Exhibit" ONLY. MISSING formal Title page withLR-11-3.8 required filer, attorney, court and case information. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Exhibit (non-trial) #9 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by January 17, 2022. (smo) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#12

(#12) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiffs Jose de Jesus Bejarano, Guadalupe Nolasco. Exhibit A as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Casillas, Alexis) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#13

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Jose de Jesus Bejarano, Guadalupe Nolasco, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , Exhibit (non-trial) #9 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #6 served on January 12, 2022. (Casillas, Alexis) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Jose de Jesus Bejarano, Guadalupe Nolasco, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , Exhibit (non-trial) #9 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #6 served on January 12, 2022. (Casillas, Alexis) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiffs Jose de Jesus Bejarano, Guadalupe Nolasco. Exhibit A as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Casillas, Alexis) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Exhibit (non-trial) #9 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by January 17, 2022. (smo) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit (non-trial) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. Page 1 is blank with "Exhibit" ONLY. MISSING formal Title page withLR-11-3.8 required filer, attorney, court and case information. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiffs Jose de Jesus Bejarano, Guadalupe Nolasco. Exhibit A : Administrative Decision as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Casillas, Alexis) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Guadalupe Nolasco, Jose de Jesus Bejarano. upon Bellflower Unified School District waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/4/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Richard D. Brady. (Catron, Steven) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (vv) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jose de Jesus Bejarano, Guadalupe Nolasco, (Catron, Steven) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Bellflower Unified School District. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. For future filings, please note that the Summons Request should be a separate entry on the docket using the event: Service Documents > Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaint > Summons Request. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32485009 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Guadalupe Nolasco, Jose de Jesus Bejarano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Attorney Steven James Catron added to party Jose de Jesus Bejarano(pty:pla), Attorney Steven James Catron added to party Guadalupe Nolasco(pty:pla))(Catron, Steven) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less