This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/04/2020 at 12:00:22 (UTC).

Nofsinger et al v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 Nofsinger filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01631

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KAREN NOFSINGER

LAUREN NOFSINGER

Defendant

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jesse Manuel Perez

Attorney at Jess M. Perez, P.C.,The Law Firm of

1717 Madison Avenue, Suite 2

Loveland, CO 80538

Defendant Attorneys

Kurt Hans Henkel

Attorney at Tucker Holmes PC

7400 East Caley Avenue, Quebec Centre Ii, Suite 300

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

Winslow Russell Taylor, III

Attorney at Tucker Holmes PC

7400 East Caley Avenue, Quebec Centre Ii, Suite 300

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jesse Manuel Perez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jesse Manuel Perez added to party Karen Nofsinger(pty:pla), Attorney Jesse Manuel Perez added to party Lauren Nofsinger(pty:pla) (Perez, Jesse) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/19/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 8/5/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/12/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/8/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#7

(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#4

(#4) RETURN of Service of Summons & Complaint upon Allstate on 14 May 2020 (cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Lauren Nofsinger, Karen Nofsinger.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Winslow Russell Taylor, III on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Winslow Russell Taylor, III added to party Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company from Weld County District Court, Case Number 2020CV30254. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7327615), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jesse Manuel Perez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jesse Manuel Perez added to party Karen Nofsinger(pty:pla), Attorney Jesse Manuel Perez added to party Lauren Nofsinger(pty:pla) (Perez, Jesse) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/19/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 8/5/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/12/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/8/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • Docket(#5) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN of Service of Summons & Complaint upon Allstate on 14 May 2020 (cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Lauren Nofsinger, Karen Nofsinger.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Winslow Russell Taylor, III on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Winslow Russell Taylor, III added to party Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company from Weld County District Court, Case Number 2020CV30254. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7327615), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Winslow Russell Taylor, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kurt Hans Henkel