This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:38:59 (UTC).

Joseph Nofal v. Michelle Moran et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Joseph Nofal filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Michelle Moran. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Pym and Jesus G. Bernal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00030

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Nofal

Defendants

Michelle Moran

Brendan O Brien

Christine Mata

Christine Bender

Robert Stephens

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Romley

Attorney at Law Office of David Romley APC

10629 Franlie Drive

Shadow Hills, CA 91040

Defendant Attorneys

Sandra L McDonough

Attorney at Paul Plevin Sullivan and Connaughton LLP

101 West Broadway 9Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101-8285

Evan A Pena

Attorney at Paul Plevin Sullivan and Connaughton LLP

101 West Broadway 9Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101-8285

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joseph Nofal. (Romley, David) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by defendants Christine Bender, Christine Mata, Michelle Moran, Brendan O Brien, Robert Stephens. Motion set for hearing on 3/30/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Pena, Evan) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#4

(#4) Notice Of Interested Parties (Romley, David) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

14 #2

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sandra L McDonough on behalf of Defendants Christine Bender, Christine Mata, Michelle Moran, Brendan O Brien, Robert Stephens (Attorney Sandra L McDonough added to party Christine Bender(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra L McDonough added to party Christine Mata(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra L McDonough added to party Michelle Moran(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra L McDonough added to party Brendan O Brien(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra L McDonough added to party Robert Stephens(pty:dft))(McDonough, Sandra) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants All Defendants, identifying The Regents of the University of California. (Pena, Evan) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Evan A Pena on behalf of Defendants Christine Bender, Christine Mata, Michelle Moran, Brendan O Brien, Robert Stephens (Attorney Evan A Pena added to party Christine Bender(pty:dft), Attorney Evan A Pena added to party Christine Mata(pty:dft), Attorney Evan A Pena added to party Michelle Moran(pty:dft), Attorney Evan A Pena added to party Brendan O Brien(pty:dft), Attorney Evan A Pena added to party Robert Stephens(pty:dft))(Pena, Evan) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendants Robert Stephens, Brendan O Brien, Michelle Moran, Christine Mata, Christine Bender.(Pena, Evan) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

14 #1

Memorandum

#3

(#3) [Request for Clerk to Issue Summons] Filed as SUPPLEMENT filed by Plaintiff Joseph Nofal. (Romley, David) Modified on 1/7/2020 (car). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Christine Bender, Christine Mata, Michelle Moran, Brendan O Brien, Robert Stephens. (car) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25065359 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Joseph Nofal. (Attorney David Romley added to party Joseph Nofal(pty:pla))(Romley, David) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Supplement #3 . The following error(s) was found: Summons request was e-filed under the wrong event. The Case Opening Clerk has modified the docket entry to indicate the true title of the document. Summons has been issued. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#10

(#10) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Miscellaneous Document #4 . Other error(s) with document(s): Document was e-filed under the wrong event. The correct event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Notices. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants All Defendants, identifying The Regents of the University of California. (Pena, Evan) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by defendants Christine Bender, Christine Mata, Michelle Moran, Brendan O Brien, Robert Stephens. Motion set for hearing on 3/30/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Pena, Evan) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendants Robert Stephens, Brendan O Brien, Michelle Moran, Christine Mata, Christine Bender.(Pena, Evan) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Evan A Pena on behalf of Defendants Christine Bender, Christine Mata, Michelle Moran, Brendan O Brien, Robert Stephens (Attorney Evan A Pena added to party Christine Bender(pty:dft), Attorney Evan A Pena added to party Christine Mata(pty:dft), Attorney Evan A Pena added to party Michelle Moran(pty:dft), Attorney Evan A Pena added to party Brendan O Brien(pty:dft), Attorney Evan A Pena added to party Robert Stephens(pty:dft))(Pena, Evan) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sandra L McDonough on behalf of Defendants Christine Bender, Christine Mata, Michelle Moran, Brendan O Brien, Robert Stephens (Attorney Sandra L McDonough added to party Christine Bender(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra L McDonough added to party Christine Mata(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra L McDonough added to party Michelle Moran(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra L McDonough added to party Brendan O Brien(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra L McDonough added to party Robert Stephens(pty:dft))(McDonough, Sandra) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Miscellaneous Document #4 . Other error(s) with document(s): Document was e-filed under the wrong event. The correct event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Notices. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Supplement #3 . The following error(s) was found: Summons request was e-filed under the wrong event. The Case Opening Clerk has modified the docket entry to indicate the true title of the document. Summons has been issued. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Christine Bender, Christine Mata, Michelle Moran, Brendan O Brien, Robert Stephens. (car) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice Of Interested Parties (Romley, David) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) [Request for Clerk to Issue Summons] Filed as SUPPLEMENT filed by Plaintiff Joseph Nofal. (Romley, David) Modified on 1/7/2020 (car). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joseph Nofal. (Romley, David) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25065359 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Joseph Nofal. (Attorney David Romley added to party Joseph Nofal(pty:pla))(Romley, David) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less