This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 14:15:35 (UTC).

Noco Company v. Valenzuela

Case Summary

On 06/04/2019 Noco Company filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Valenzuela. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara Lioi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01276

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara Lioi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Noco Company

Noco Company doing business as NOCO

Defendants

Francisco Valenzuela

Francisco Valenzuela doing business as cisco7_97

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sean P. Malone

Attorney at Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland

29Th Floor, One Cleveland Center, 1375 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

David R. Posteraro

Attorney at Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland

29Th Floor, One Cleveland Center, 1375 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Jon J. Pinney

Attorney at Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland

29Th Floor, One Cleveland Center, 1375 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Exhibit A - Fed Ex Tracking Details

#5

(#5) Return of Service unexecuted upon Defendant Francisco Valenzuela. Service attempted by via Federal Express on June 12, 2019 filed on behalf of Noco Company Related document(s) #1 , #3 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fed Ex Tracking Details)(Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

4 #2

Appendix B - Exhibit List

4 #1

Appendix A - Witness List

#4

(#4) Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(T,Je) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

3 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#3

(#3) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Francisco Valenzuela. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Cease and Desist Letter

1 #1

Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Francisco Valenzuela. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9342949.. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Cease and Desist Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service unexecuted upon Defendant Francisco Valenzuela. Service attempted by via Federal Express on June 12, 2019 filed on behalf of Noco Company Related document(s) #1 , #3 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fed Ex Tracking Details)(Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(T,Je) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Francisco Valenzuela. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint with jury demand against Francisco Valenzuela. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9342949.. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Cease and Desist Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less