This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 17:26:33 (UTC).

Noco Company v. Rivera

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 Noco Company filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Rivera. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patricia A. Gaughan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01933

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patricia A. Gaughan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noco Company

Defendants

Marissa Rivera

Marissa Rivera doing business as Discount76y

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sean P. Malone

Attorney at Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland

29Th Floor, One Cleveland Center, 1375 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

David R. Posteraro

Attorney at Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland

29Th Floor, One Cleveland Center, 1375 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Jon J. Pinney

Attorney at Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland

29Th Floor, One Cleveland Center, 1375 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Marissa Rivera placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: ordinary mail. (Y,A) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Mailing

#6

(#6) Request to Clerk for service upon Marissa Rivera by Ordinary Mail. filed by Noco Company. Related document(s) #5 , #1 , #3 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Mailing)(Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#5

(#5) Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Marissa Rivera. Service attempted by Certified on 9/11/19 filed on behalf of Noco Company. Related document(s) #3 . (J,FE) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#4

(#4) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 10/25/2019 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 9/03/19. (D,Ma) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

3 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#3

(#3) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Marissa Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Cease and Desist Letter

1 #2

Exhibit B - Defendant's sales on eBay

1 #1

Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Marissa Rivera. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9487437.. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's sales on eBay, #3 Exhibit C - Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketOrder [non-document]: Case Management Conference set 10/25/19 has been continued to 12/2/19 at 9:00 a.m. to allow time for the Defendants to file an answer. Case Management Conference will be conducted by telephone with the Court initiating the call. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 10/16/19. (LC,S) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Marissa Rivera placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: ordinary mail. (Y,A) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request to Clerk for service upon Marissa Rivera by Ordinary Mail. filed by Noco Company. Related document(s) #5 , #1 , #3 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Mailing)(Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Marissa Rivera. Service attempted by Certified on 9/11/19 filed on behalf of Noco Company. Related document(s) #3 . (J,FE) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 10/25/2019 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 9/03/19. (D,Ma) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Marissa Rivera placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70183090000032251564. (W,Jo) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Marissa Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, (B,R) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint with jury demand against Marissa Rivera. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9487437.. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's sales on eBay, #3 Exhibit C - Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less