This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 17:26:36 (UTC).

Noco Company v. Barber

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 Noco Company filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Barber. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Solomon Oliver, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01935

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Solomon Oliver, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noco Company

Defendants

Michael Barber

Michael Barber doing business as Wakezonemarine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sean P. Malone

Attorney at Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland

29Th Floor, One Cleveland Center, 1375 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

David R. Posteraro

Attorney at Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland

29Th Floor, One Cleveland Center, 1375 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Jon J. Pinney

Attorney at Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland

29Th Floor, One Cleveland Center, 1375 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Order of Voluntary Case Dismissal, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and court costs. Related document #4 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 8/28/2019. (R,Sh) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#4

(#4) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Noco Company. (Malone, Sean) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

3 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#3

(#3) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Michael Barber. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Cease and Desist Letter

1 #2

Exhibit B - Defendant's sales on eBay

1 #1

Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Michael Barber. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9487496.. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's sales on eBay, #3 Exhibit C - Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order of Voluntary Case Dismissal, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and court costs. Related document #4 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 8/28/2019. (R,Sh) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Noco Company. (Malone, Sean) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Michael Barber. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (B,R) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint with jury demand against Michael Barber. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9487496.. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's sales on eBay, #3 Exhibit C - Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less