This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2019 at 07:17:38 (UTC).

Noco Company v. Ball

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 Noco Company filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Ball. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01505

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noco Company

Defendant

Christopher Ball

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jon J. Pinney

Attorney at Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland

29Th Floor, One Cleveland Center, 1375 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Sean P. Malone

Attorney at Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland

29Th Floor, One Cleveland Center, 1375 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

David R. Posteraro

Attorney at Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland

29Th Floor, One Cleveland Center, 1375 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

3 #3

Exhibit C - Cease and Desist Letter

#1

(#1) FILING ERROR. Document incomplete. Attorney refilled as document #3 .Complaint with jury demand against Christopher Ball. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9394260. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Sales on Ebay.com, #3 Exhibit C - Cease and Decease Letter, #4 Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Pinney, Jon) Modified on 7/1/2019 (B,R). (Entered: 07/01/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement

#5

(#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Christopher Ball on 7/15/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Noco Company (Related document(s) #4 ) (J,FE) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

3 #4

Summons

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#7

(#7) Order of Dismissal with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and court costs. (Realted document #6 ). Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/23/2019. (K,K) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #5

Summons Summons

#6

(#6) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Noco Company. (Malone, Sean) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

4 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement

3 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#1) FILING ERROR. Document incomplete. Attorney refilled as document #3 .Complaint with jury demand against Christopher Ball. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9394260. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Sales on Ebay.com, #3 Exhibit C - Cease and Decease Letter, #4 Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Pinney, Jon) Modified on 7/1/2019 (B,R). (Entered: 07/01/2019)

3 #2

Exhibit B - Sales on Ebay.com

#4

(#4) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Christopher Ball. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order of Dismissal with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and court costs. (Realted document #6 ). Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/23/2019. (K,K) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Noco Company. (Malone, Sean) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Christopher Ball on 7/15/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Noco Company (Related document(s) #4 ) (J,FE) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Christopher Ball placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70183090000032259966. (Y,A) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Christopher Ball. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (B,R) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (B,R) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Complaint with Jury Demand, filed by Noco Company. Filing Fee Paid $400.00. Receipt Number 0647-9394260 Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Sales on Ebay.com, #3 Exhibit C - Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILING ERROR. Document incomplete. Attorney refilled as document #3 .Complaint with jury demand against Christopher Ball. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9394260. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Sales on Ebay.com, #3 Exhibit C - Cease and Decease Letter, #4 Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Pinney, Jon) Modified on 7/1/2019 (B,R). (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.