This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2022 at 07:48:46 (UTC).

Noblewood IP LLC v. Wolters Kluwer U.S. Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 Noblewood IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Wolters Kluwer U S Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vacant Judgeship (2022). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00690

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vacant Judgeship (2022)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noblewood IP LLC

Defendant

Wolters Kluwer U.S. Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Grant McArthur

Defendant Attorney

Anne Shea Gaza

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to move against, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to August 26, 2022 - filed by Wolters Kluwer U.S. Corporation. (Gaza, Anne) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to move against, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 25, 2022 - filed by Wolters Kluwer U.S. Corporation. (Gaza, Anne) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Grant McArthur - filed by Noblewood IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noblewood IP LLC. Wolters Kluwer U.S. Corporation served on 6/2/2022, answer due 6/23/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#7

(#7) VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (etg) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Wolters Kluwer U.S. Corporation on 5/27/2022. (apk) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Noblewood IP LLC. (apk) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,941,553. (apk) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

List of Related Cases

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to move against, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to August 26, 2022 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Wolters Kluwer U.S. Corporation answer due 8/26/2022). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/21/2022. (dlw) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to move against, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to August 26, 2022 - filed by Wolters Kluwer U.S. Corporation. (Gaza, Anne) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to move against, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 25, 2022 filed by Wolters Kluwer U.S. Corporation -- Reset Answer Deadline: Wolters Kluwer U.S. Corporation answer due 7/25/2022. ORDERED by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/21/22. (ntl) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to move against, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 25, 2022 - filed by Wolters Kluwer U.S. Corporation. (Gaza, Anne) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Grant McArthur for Noblewood IP LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Grant McArthur filed by Noblewood IP LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/10/2022. (dlw) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Grant McArthur - filed by Noblewood IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noblewood IP LLC. Wolters Kluwer U.S. Corporation served on 6/2/2022, answer due 6/23/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (etg) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • Docket(#6) ORAL ORDER: This case has been assigned to the District of Delaware's Vacant Judgeship ("VAC"). Detailed information relating to VAC cases may be found in the Court's Announcement of March 3, 2022 and Standing Order No. 2022-VAC-1 (March 9, 2022), which are found on the Court's website. Consistent with the foregoing Announcement and Standing Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file the "Notice of Consent or Absence of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge," being docketed along with the instant order, no later than sixty (60) days after service of the Complaint on the first defendant that is served. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Notice, Consent, and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, previously docketed in this case, are VACATED. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 6/1/2022. (etg) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2022). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Wolters Kluwer U.S. Corporation on 5/27/2022. (apk) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Noblewood IP LLC. (apk) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,941,553. (apk) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Wolters Kluwer U.S. Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3883466.) - filed by Noblewood IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 List of Related Cases, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less