This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2022 at 09:11:03 (UTC).

Noblewood IP LLC v. Southern Newspapers Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 Noblewood IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Southern Newspapers Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Marina Garcia Marmolejo and John A Kazen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00064

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marina Garcia Marmolejo

Referral Judge

John A Kazen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noblewood IP LLC

Defendant

Southern Newspapers Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Papool S Chaudhari

Attorney at PRA Law

2800 Bartons Bluff Lane #1902

Austin, TX 78746

Defendant Attorney

Robert Parke Latham

Attorney at Jackson Walker

2323 Ross Ave, Ste 600

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #3

Exhibit 2

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Southern Newspapers Inc., filed.(Chaudhari, Papool) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Southern Newspapers Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RaulGamas, 5) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) ORDER. The Court GRANTS Defendant's Unopposed #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant's new deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED to 9/2/2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER. The Court GRANTS Defendant's Unopposed #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant's new deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED to 9/2/2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to ComplaintMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Southern Newspapers Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Latham, Robert) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Southern Newspapers Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RaulGamas, 5) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Southern Newspapers Inc., filed.(Chaudhari, Papool) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Southern Newspapers Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28399965) filed by Noblewood IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Chaudhari, Papool) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less