This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2022 at 07:29:47 (UTC).

Noblewood IP LLC v. Hexagon Manufacturing Intelligence Inc

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 Noblewood IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Hexagon Manufacturing Intelligence Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jane J Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-02399

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane J Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noblewood IP LLC

Defendant

Hexagon Manufacturing Intelligence Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hao Ni

Attorney at Ni Wang & Massand PLLC

8140 Walnut Hill Lane, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75231

Raymond W Mort, III

Attorney at The Mort Law Firm, PLLC

501 Congress Ave, Suite 150

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant Attorney

Michael C Smith

Attorney at Scheef & Stone, LLP

113 East Austin Street

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

1 #2

Exhibit(s) 2

1 #3

Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (AO120) filed by Noblewood IP LLC (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Noblewood IP LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mms) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Hexagon Manufacturing Intelligence Inc. (mms) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

#6

(#6) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mms) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Proposed Amendment

11 #11

Main Document

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise plead is now 1/4/2023. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 12/21/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Hexagon Manufacturing Intelligence Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise plead is now due 12/21/2022. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 11/23/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Hexagon Manufacturing Intelligence Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment) (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Defendant has not provided the Court with any grounds to find good cause. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 11/22/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Hexagon Manufacturing Intelligence Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Michael C Smith added to party Hexagon Manufacturing Intelligence Inc(pty:dft) (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Jane J Boyle. Senior Judge A. Joe Fish no longer assigned to the case per SO 3-340. (axm) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mms) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Hexagon Manufacturing Intelligence Inc. (mms) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mms) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Noblewood IP LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (AO120) filed by Noblewood IP LLC (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Hexagon Manufacturing Intelligence Inc filed by Noblewood IP LLC. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13258698) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Cover Sheet) (Ni, Hao) Modified text on 10/27/2022 (mms). (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Noblewood IP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Charles Smith