This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2022 at 08:41:35 (UTC).

Noblewood IP LLC v. Dotdash Meredith, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 Noblewood IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Dotdash Meredith, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Vacant Judgeship (2022) and Sherry R. Fallon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00267

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vacant Judgeship (2022)

Referral Judge

Sherry R. Fallon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noblewood IP LLC

Defendant

Dotdash Meredith, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Kirk J. Anderson

Defendant Attorney

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint and File Proposed Scheduling Order to 05/19/2022 - filed by Noblewood IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ozzie A. Farres, Attorney Michael A. Oakes, Attorney Yisun Song, and Attorney Steven L. Wood - filed by Dotdash Meredith, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#11

(#11) VAC Magistrate Non-Consent completed by the parties filed by Dotdash Meredith, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Dotdash to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to April 25, 2022 - filed by Dotdash Meredith, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#9

No Description Available

#7

(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kirk J. Anderson - filed by Noblewood IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noblewood IP LLC. Dotdash Meredith, Inc. served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Noblewood IP LLC. (mal) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,941,553. (mal) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

1 #6

Related Cases

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Dotdash Meredith, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3813702.) - filed by Noblewood IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Related Cases)(mal) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED- re #14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint and File Proposed Scheduling Order to 05/19/2022. Reset Answer Deadlines: Dotdash Meredith, Inc. answer due 5/19/2022. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/20/2022. (lih) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint and File Proposed Scheduling Order to 05/19/2022 - filed by Noblewood IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED- re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ozzie A. Farres, Attorney Michael A. Oakes, Attorney Yisun Song, and Attorney Steven L. Wood. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/18/2022. (lih) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ozzie A. Farres, Attorney Michael A. Oakes, Attorney Yisun Song, and Attorney Steven L. Wood - filed by Dotdash Meredith, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Kirk J. Anderson for Noblewood IP LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORAL ORDER Re: D.I. #11 : Pursuant to ¶ 5(b)-(c) of the Court's Standing Order No. 2022-VAC-1, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: (1) On or before April 12, 2022, the parties shall: (a) hold a Rule 26(f) conference; (b) commence discovery; and (c) inform the Court as to whether the need for coordinated discovery is anticipated as to related Civil Action No. 22-134-VAC-SRF. (2) The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order within 30 days of the Rule 26(f) conference. The Court's form scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard form of scheduling order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed scheduling order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties' proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. (3) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) is set for 5/24/2022 at 12:00 p.m. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on April 6, 2022. (lih) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • Docket(#12) ORAL ORDER: The parties having filed the appropriate form advising the Court that they do not unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, until further order of the Court, this case will remain assigned to the VAC (2022) docket. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon solely for the following purposes: (1) to adjudicate discovery (including fact and expert discovery) and protective order disputes; (2) to issue or modify a scheduling order; (3) to review stipulated orders and pro hac vice motions; and (4) to review requests for mediation in cases other than patent and securities cases. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 4/6/22. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00134-VAC, 1:22-cv-00267-VAC (ntl) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) VAC Magistrate Non-Consent completed by the parties filed by Dotdash Meredith, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Dotdash to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to April 25, 2022 filed by Dotdash Meredith, Inc. Reset Answer Deadlines: Dotdash Meredith, Inc. answer due 4/25/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/25/2022. (etg) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Dotdash to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to April 25, 2022 - filed by Dotdash Meredith, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (9 in 1:22-cv-00134-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kirk J. Anderson filed by Noblewood IP LLC, (8 in 1:22-cv-00135-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kirk J. Anderson filed by Noblewood IP LLC, (7 in 1:22-cv-00267-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kirk J. Anderson filed by Noblewood IP LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/22/2022. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00267-LPS, 1:22-cv-00134-LPS, 1:22-cv-00135-LPS(etg) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark of the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (etg) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kirk J. Anderson - filed by Noblewood IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noblewood IP LLC. Dotdash Meredith, Inc. served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00267-LPS, 1:22-cv-00269-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Noblewood IP LLC. (mal) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,941,553. (mal) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Dotdash Meredith, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3813702.) - filed by Noblewood IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Related Cases)(mal) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth Laurence Dorsney