This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2022 at 07:56:38 (UTC).

Noblewood IP LLC v. DHL Express (USA), Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 Noblewood IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against DHL Express USA , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando L. Garcia. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01127

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orlando L. Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noblewood IP LLC

Defendant

DHL Express (USA), Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond W Mort, III

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Noblewood IP LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Noblewood IP LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to DHL Express (USA), Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Proposed Order

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot2) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot2) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Noblewood IP LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: DHL Express (USA), Inc. answer due 12/23/2022. (bw) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is hereby EXTENDED until December 23, 2022 entered by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by DHL Express (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCarty, Richard) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to DHL Express (USA), Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Noblewood IP LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Noblewood IP LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16691168), filed by Noblewood IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia due to related cases. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less