This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2022 at 07:31:57 (UTC).

Noblewood IP LLC v. Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 Noblewood IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael J. Truncale. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:22-CV-00084

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. Truncale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noblewood IP LLC

Defendant

Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kirk Anderson

Attorney at Budo Law PC - CO

5610 Ward Rd, Suite 300

Arvada, CO 80002

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Noblewood IP LLC (Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas, LLC. and emailed back to Attorney for service. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Noblewood IP LLC (Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and the Parties shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. It is further ORDERED that all Court dates and deadlines are hereby vacated, and all pending motions filed herein are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 7/1/22. (ljw, ) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ljw, ) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ljw, ) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and the Parties shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. It is further ORDERED that all Court dates and deadlines are hereby vacated, and all pending motions filed herein are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 7/1/22. (ljw, ) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Noblewood IP LLC (Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas, LLC. and emailed back to Attorney for service. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Noblewood IP LLC. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Noblewood IP LLC (Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BTXEDC-8949282.), filed by Noblewood IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less