This case was last updated from PACER on 10/31/2020 at 08:58:21 (UTC).

NMSURF, Inc. v. City of Santa Fe

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 NMSURF, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against City of Santa Fe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly H. Rankin and Nancy D. Freudenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00891

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly H. Rankin

Presiding Judge

Nancy D. Freudenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NMSURF, Inc.

Defendant

City of Santa Fe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard S. Glassman

Attorney at Catron, Catron & Pottow, P.A.

P.O. Box 788

Santa Fe, NM 87504-0788

Defendant Attorney

Marcos D. Martinez

Attorney at City of Santa Fe

202 Lincoln Avenue

Santa Fe, NM 87501

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MOTION for Hearing re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief by NMSURF, Inc.. (Glassman, Richard) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File until 10/16/2020 (mjh) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#5

(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer and Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary and Injunctive Relief by City of Santa Fe. (Martinez, Marcos) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Marcos D. Martinez on behalf of City of Santa Fe (Martinez, Marcos) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NMSURF, Inc.. City of Santa Fe served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (Glassman, Richard) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

2 #9

Exhibit Exhibit 9

2 #8

Exhibit Exhibit 8

2 #7

Exhibit Exhibit 7

2 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 6

2 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5

2 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4

2 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

2 #2

Exhibit Exhbit 2

2 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#2

(#2) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief by NMSURF, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhbit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9) (Glassman, Richard) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 1-3

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1-1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declatory Judgment and Injunctive Relief against City of Santa Fe ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by NMSURF. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1-2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1-3)(Glassman, Richard) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions No Longer Referred: #7 MOTION for Hearing re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief (mb) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Hearing re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief by NMSURF, Inc.. (Glassman, Richard) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File until 10/16/2020 (mjh) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer and Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary and Injunctive Relief by City of Santa Fe. (Martinez, Marcos) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Marcos D. Martinez on behalf of City of Santa Fe (Martinez, Marcos) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions No Longer Referred: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief (anl) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NMSURF, Inc.. City of Santa Fe served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (Glassman, Richard) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief by NMSURF, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhbit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9) (Glassman, Richard) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to City of Santa Fe. (arp) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketUnited States District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal and United States Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin assigned. (arp) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7286218 re #1 Complaint, filed by NMSURF (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Glassman, Richard) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declatory Judgment and Injunctive Relief against City of Santa Fe ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by NMSURF. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1-2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1-3)(Glassman, Richard) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less