This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 12:30:25 (UTC).

NJ Products, INC. v. Weiman Products, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 NJ Products, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Weiman Products, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Norgle, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02209

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Norgle, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

NJ Products, INC.

John C. Wagner, Sr.

Defendant

Weiman Products, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Micro-Scientific Industries, Inc

Counter Claimant

Weiman Products, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Mason Scott Cole

Attorney at Cole Sadkin, Llc

20 S. Clark Street,, Suite 500

Chicago, IL 60606

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Katherine Laatsch Fink

Attorney at Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

71 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 3600

Chicago, IL 60606

Anthony John Denis

Attorney at Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

71 South Wacker Drive, Suite 3600

Chicago, IL 60606

Joseph J. Berghammer

Attorney at Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

71 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 3600

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Counter Defendant John C. Wagner, Sr. (ng, ) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Weiman Products, LLC (Berghammer, Joseph) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Weiman Products, LLC against NJ Products, INC., John C. Wagner, Sr . by Weiman Products, LLC(Berghammer, Joseph) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Weiman Products, LLC by Anthony John Denis (Denis, Anthony) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Weiman Products, LLC by Katherine Laatsch Fink (Fink, Katherine) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Weiman Products, LLC by Joseph J. Berghammer (Berghammer, Joseph) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: John C. Wagner, Sr added to case caption. (Berghammer, Joseph) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATUS Report by NJ Products, INC. (Tatooles, Dean) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (rp, ) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, ) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Cole, Mason) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by NJ Products, INC.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16920202.(Cole, Mason) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Weiman Products, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony J. Denis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine Laatsch Fink

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph J. Berghammer