This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2019 at 09:56:50 (UTC).

Niyazov v. Alltran Financial, LP et al

Case Summary

On 04/25/2019 Niyazov filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Alltran Financial, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Orenstein and Allyne R. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02413

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James Orenstein

Presiding Judge

Allyne R. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Niyazov

Defendants

Alltran Financial, LP

URS Management, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tiffany N. Hardy

Attorney at Edelman Combs Latturner & Goodwin LLC

20 South Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Edward Y. Kroub

Attorney at Cohen & Mizrahi LLP

300 Cadman Plaza West, 12Th Floor

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Daniel C Cohen

Attorney at Cohen & Mizrahi LLP

300 Cadman Plaza West, 12Th Floor

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Defendant Attorney

Denise Lynne Plunkett

Attorney at Ballard Spahr

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022-3915

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: July 19, 2019. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: August 20, 2019. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: September 20, 2019. All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by:October 22, 2019. Pretrial Conference (ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): November 6, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: November 18, 2019. Joint pretrial order due by:30 days after resolution of any dispositive motions. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/19/2019. (Guy, Alicia) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

13 #1

Questionnaire

#13

(#13) ORDER -- I will not require an initial discovery planning conference in this case, and the parties are not required to meet and confer in accordance with Rule 26(f). Instead, I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that contemplates the completion of all discovery within four months. If there is an objection to the court's schedule, any party may either: (1) upon a showing of good cause and with the other party's consent, submit a proposed discovery plan in the form of the attached questionnaire; or (2) submit a letter request for an in-court conference that also sets forth the grounds for a different schedule. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Questionnaire) (Guy, Alicia) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Alltran Financial, LP, URS Management, LLC. (Plunkett, Denise) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#11

(#11) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Plaintiff's Consent by Alltran Financial, LP, URS Management, LLC. (Plunkett, Denise) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Lynne Plunkett on behalf of Alltran Financial, LP, URS Management, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Plunkett, Denise) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Niyazov. Alltran Financial, LP served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/27/2019. (Hardy, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Niyazov. URS Management, LLC served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Hardy, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C Cohen on behalf of Joseph Niyazov (aty to be noticed) (Cohen, Daniel) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Y. Kroub on behalf of Joseph Niyazov (aty to be noticed) (Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany N. Hardy on behalf of Joseph Niyazov (notification declined or already on case) (Hardy, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 URS summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

1 #3

Proposed Summons To Defendant URS Management

1 #2

Proposed Summons To Defendant Alltran

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Alltran Financial, LP, URS Management, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11419815 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Joseph Niyazov. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons To Defendant Alltran, #3 Proposed Summons To Defendant URS Management) (Hardy, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: July 19, 2019. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: August 20, 2019. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: September 20, 2019. All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by:October 22, 2019. Pretrial Conference (ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): November 6, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: November 18, 2019. Joint pretrial order due by:30 days after resolution of any dispositive motions. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/19/2019. (Guy, Alicia) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER -- I will not require an initial discovery planning conference in this case, and the parties are not required to meet and confer in accordance with Rule 26(f). Instead, I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that contemplates the completion of all discovery within four months. If there is an objection to the court's schedule, any party may either: (1) upon a showing of good cause and with the other party's consent, submit a proposed discovery plan in the form of the attached questionnaire; or (2) submit a letter request for an in-court conference that also sets forth the grounds for a different schedule. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Questionnaire) (Guy, Alicia) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Alltran Financial, LP, URS Management, LLC. (Plunkett, Denise) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted. The defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by June 11, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 5/29/2019. (Gustafson, Kaelyn) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Plaintiff's Consent by Alltran Financial, LP, URS Management, LLC. (Plunkett, Denise) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Lynne Plunkett on behalf of Alltran Financial, LP, URS Management, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Plunkett, Denise) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Niyazov. Alltran Financial, LP served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/27/2019. (Hardy, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Niyazov. URS Management, LLC served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Hardy, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C Cohen on behalf of Joseph Niyazov (aty to be noticed) (Cohen, Daniel) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Y. Kroub on behalf of Joseph Niyazov (aty to be noticed) (Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany N. Hardy on behalf of Joseph Niyazov (notification declined or already on case) (Hardy, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 URS summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Alltran Financial, LP, URS Management, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11419815 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Joseph Niyazov. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons To Defendant Alltran, #3 Proposed Summons To Defendant URS Management) (Hardy, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where URS MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLTRAN FINANCIAL, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Denise L. Plunkett Esq.