This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:43:37 (UTC).

Nix v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 Nix filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-03720

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cynthia Nix

Defendants

Ethicon Women's Health and Urology

Johnson & Johnson

Gynecare

Ethicon Inc

Ethicon, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bobby J. Bradford

Attorney at AYLSTOCK WITKIN KREIS & OVERHOLTZ

Suite 200, 17 East Main Street

Pensacola, FL 32502

Daniel J. Thornburgh

Attorney at Aylstock, Witkin, Kreis, and Overholtz

17 East Main Street, Suite 200

Pensacola, FL 32502

Bryan F. Aylstock

Attorney at Aylstock, Witkin, Kreis, and Overholtz

17 East Main Street, Suite 200

Pensacola, FL 32502

Donald Douglas Grubbs

Attorney at Grubbs Law Firm

11200 Fuqua St, Ste 120

Houston, TX 77089

Lisa L. Causey

Attorney at SALIM-BEASLEY

1901 Texas Street

Natchitoches, LA 71457

Douglass A Kreis

Attorney at Aylstock Witkin et al

803 North Palafox St

Pensacola, FL 32501

Defendant Attorneys

Alyssa Brittany McDaniel

Attorney at Beck Redden LLP

1221 Mckinney St, Suite 4500

Houston, TX 77010

Benjamin McRae Watson

Attorney at Butler Snow

Kathryn June Skagerberg

Attorney at Beck Redden LLP

1221 Mckinney, Ste 4500

Houston, TX 77010

Kasey Mitchell Adams

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Tracy J Van Steenburgh

Attorney at Nilan Johnson Lewis PA

120 S 6Th St Ste 400

Mpls, MN 55402

Kathleen A Gallagher

Attorney at Beck Redden Secrest

1221 Mckinney St, Ste 4500

Houston, TX 77010

Christy D Jones

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP

Po Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158

David B. Thomas

Attorney at Thomas Combs & Spann

P. O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Susan M. Robinson

Attorney at THOMAS COMBS & SPANN

P. O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Philip J. Combs

Attorney at THOMAS COMBS & SPANN

P. O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Kari L. Sutherland

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 1138

Oxford, MS 38655

Laura H. Dixon

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Timothy C. Holm

Attorney at MODRALL SPERLING ROEHL HARRIS & SISK

P. O. Box 2168

Albuquerque, NM 87103-2168

William M Gage

Attorney at Butler Snow

Po Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#195

#194

#193

#192

#191

#190

#189

187 #1

Proposed Order

#187

#3

#2

1 #6

Exhibit Summons

1 #5

Exhibit Summons

1 #4

Exhibit Summons

1 #3

Exhibit Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Notice of Related Case

#1

687 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#195) ORDER granting #191 Motion for Bryan F. Aylstock to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#194) ORDER granting #192 Motion for Daniel J. Thornburgh to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#193) ORDER granting #190 Motion for Bobby J. Bradford to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#192) MOTION for Daniel J. Thornburgh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cynthia Nix, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/15/2020. (Monsour, Douglas) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#191) MOTION for Bryan F. Aylstock to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cynthia Nix, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/15/2020. (Monsour, Douglas) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#190) MOTION for Bobby J. Bradford to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cynthia Nix, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/15/2020. (Monsour, Douglas) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#189) ORDER granting #187 Motion to Substitute Attorney Attorney William M Gage; Timothy C. Holm; Christy D Jones; Susan M. Robinson; Kari L. Sutherland; David B. Thomas; Benjamin McRae Watson; Kasey Mitchell Adams; Tracy J. Van Steenburgh, and Philip J. Combs terminated.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#188) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson, filed.(Cowan, Christopher) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#187) Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Christopher Cowan in place of Christy Jones, David Thomas, Philip Combs, Susan Robinson, Timothy Holm, Tracy Van Steenburgh, Benjamin McRae Watson, Kari Sutherland, Kasey Adams, William Gage by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cowan, Christopher) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#186) NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Fillmore on behalf of Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson, filed. (Fillmore, Katherine) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
183 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Texas Southern; Case Number 4:12-cv-00910. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/24/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • DocketInterdistrict transfer to Southern District of West Virginia. Case transferred electronically. (ltien, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/24/2012.] (Entered: 04/24/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (12) (certified copy) transferring case to Southern District of West Virginia to be included in MDL Docket No. 2327. Case terminated on 4/24/2012. Parties notified.(ltien, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/24/2012.] (Entered: 04/24/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, A Division of Ethicon, Inc., filed.(pyebernetsky, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/24/2012.] (Entered: 03/30/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson, filed.(pyebernetsky, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/24/2012.] (Entered: 03/30/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Gynecare, filed.(pyebernetsky, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/24/2012.] (Entered: 03/30/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Ethicon Inc, filed.(pyebernetsky, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/24/2012.] (Entered: 03/30/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet Corrected by Cynthia Nix, filed.(Monsour, Douglas) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/24/2012.] (Entered: 03/28/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/29/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(saustin, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/24/2012.] (Entered: 03/28/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0541-9483322) filed by Cynthia Nix. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Related Case, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Summons, #5 Exhibit Summons, #6 Exhibit Summons)(Monsour, Douglas) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/24/2012.] (Entered: 03/26/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ethicon Women's Health and Urology is a litigant

Latest cases where Gynecare is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant