This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/05/2021 at 08:32:26 (UTC).

NIRENBERG et al v. GEICO

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 NIRENBERG filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GEICO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is R. BARCLAY SURRICK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01611

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. BARCLAY SURRICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARC D. NIRENBERG

LORIE A. NIRENBERG

Defendant

GEICO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARD A. WOLFE

Attorney at TabakinWolfe, LLP

1000 Germantown Pike, B-3

Plymouth, PA 19462

Defendant Attorney

KRISTINE MARIE MEINDL

Attorney at Palmer & Barr, PC

1880 John F. Kennedy Blvd., Suite 401

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 05/20/21. 05/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dmd, ) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER THAT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI WILL BE SCHEDULED AT THE REQUEST OF COUNSEL; DISCOVERY DUE BY 11/8/2021. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 5/19/21. 5/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER THAT CLERK OF COURT PLACE THIS MATTER IN THE ARBITRATION TRACK. FURTHER ORDERED THIS MATTER BE SCHEDULED FOR ARBITRATION IN LATE NOVEMBER OR EARLY DECEMBER 2021. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 5/19/21. 5/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) Discovery Plan by GEICO.(MEINDL, KRISTINE) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/14/2021 11:00 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 4/23/21. 4/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#4

(#4) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint together with to Complaint by GEICO.(MEINDL, KRISTINE) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#3

(#3) STIPULATION to Complaint by GEICO. (MEINDL, KRISTINE) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTINE MARIE MEINDL on behalf of GEICO (MEINDL, KRISTINE) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

1 #3

Case Management Track Form Case Management Track Designation Form

1 #2

Designation Form Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against GEICO ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15035200.), filed by LORIE A. NIRENBERG, MARC D. NIRENBERG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #2 Designation Form Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form Case Management Track Designation Form)(WOLFE, RICHARD) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 05/20/21. 05/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dmd, ) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER THAT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI WILL BE SCHEDULED AT THE REQUEST OF COUNSEL; DISCOVERY DUE BY 11/8/2021. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 5/19/21. 5/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER THAT CLERK OF COURT PLACE THIS MATTER IN THE ARBITRATION TRACK. FURTHER ORDERED THIS MATTER BE SCHEDULED FOR ARBITRATION IN LATE NOVEMBER OR EARLY DECEMBER 2021. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 5/19/21. 5/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK Pretrial Conference held on 5/14/21. (rf, ) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Discovery Plan by GEICO.(MEINDL, KRISTINE) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/14/2021 11:00 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 4/23/21. 4/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint together with to Complaint by GEICO.(MEINDL, KRISTINE) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION to Complaint by GEICO. (MEINDL, KRISTINE) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTINE MARIE MEINDL on behalf of GEICO (MEINDL, KRISTINE) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to GEICO. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 4/7/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by LORIE A. NIRENBERG, MARC D. NIRENBERG. (md, ) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GEICO ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15035200.), filed by LORIE A. NIRENBERG, MARC D. NIRENBERG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #2 Designation Form Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form Case Management Track Designation Form)(WOLFE, RICHARD) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Geico is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHARD A. WOLFE