This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2019 at 07:34:06 (UTC).

Nino-Guerrero v. USA

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 Nino-Guerrero filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Diana Saldana. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00086

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Diana Saldana

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Karen Thalia Nino-Guerrero

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Respondent

USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

U.S. Attorney's Office

Attorney at Appellate Division

P.O. Box 61129

Houston, TX 77208-1129

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION for Reconsideration of #4 Order, by Karen Thalia Nino-Guerrero, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/28/2019. (mxperez, 5) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER denying Petitioner's #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) as to Criminal Case No. 5:15-CR-1337 (Defendant No. 1). COA DENIED. The Court certifies that any appeal from this decision would not be taken in good faith and therefore should not be taken in forma pauperis. (Signed by Judge Diana Saldana) Parties notified.(dmorales, 5) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (dmorales, 5) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) as to Criminal Case No. 5:15-CR-1337 (Defendant No. 1) by Karen Thalia Nino-Guerrero, filed. (dmorales, 5) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Reconsideration of #4 Order, by Karen Thalia Nino-Guerrero, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/28/2019. (mxperez, 5) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER denying Petitioner's #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) as to Criminal Case No. 5:15-CR-1337 (Defendant No. 1). COA DENIED. The Court certifies that any appeal from this decision would not be taken in good faith and therefore should not be taken in forma pauperis. (Signed by Judge Diana Saldana) Parties notified.(dmorales, 5) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (dmorales, 5) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) as to Criminal Case No. 5:15-CR-1337 (Defendant No. 1) by Karen Thalia Nino-Guerrero, filed. (dmorales, 5) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less