This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/13/2023 at 07:20:52 (UTC).

Ningbo Futai Electric Limited v. QVC, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 Ningbo Futai Electric Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against QVC, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark C. Scarsi and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-02015

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ningbo Futai Electric Limited

Defendant

QVC, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan C Chen

Attorney at Rimon PC

2029 Century Park East Suite 400N

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorney

John K Rubiner

Attorney at Freeman Mathis and Gary LLP

550 South Hope Street 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to QVC, Inc. answer now due 2/6/2023, filed by defendant QVC, Inc..(Attorney John K Rubiner added to party QVC, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rubiner, John) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

#15

(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ningbo Futai Electric Limited, upon Defendant QVC, Inc. served on 12/16/2022, answer due 1/6/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Deveau, Agent of Process Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chen, Alan) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#14

(#14) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER AND/OR REASSIGNMENT OF PATENT CASE by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato and Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes to Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 5:22-cv-02015-MCS(RAOx). (ap) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

#12

(#12) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete, or incorrect. Other error(s) with document(s): The case number is missing the judge initials. The complete case number is 5:22-cv-02015-SSS (KKx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#10

(#10) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Ningbo Futai Electric Limited. (Chen, Alan) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ningbo Futai Electric Limited, identifying Ningbo Futai Electric Limited and QVC, Inc.. (Chen, Alan) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 11 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately. The correct event category is located under Civil Events - Other Filings - Miscellaneous Filings. (car) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #1

Exhibit A

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to QVC, Inc. answer now due 2/6/2023, filed by defendant QVC, Inc..(Attorney John K Rubiner added to party QVC, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rubiner, John) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ningbo Futai Electric Limited, upon Defendant QVC, Inc. served on 12/16/2022, answer due 1/6/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Deveau, Agent of Process Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chen, Alan) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER AND/OR REASSIGNMENT OF PATENT CASE by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato and Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes to Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 5:22-cv-02015-MCS(RAOx). (ap) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete, or incorrect. Other error(s) with document(s): The case number is missing the judge initials. The complete case number is 5:22-cv-02015-SSS (KKx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Ningbo Futai Electric Limited. (Chen, Alan) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ningbo Futai Electric Limited, identifying Ningbo Futai Electric Limited and QVC, Inc.. (Chen, Alan) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 11 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately. The correct event category is located under Civil Events - Other Filings - Miscellaneous Filings. (car) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant QVC, Inc. (car) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (car) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Ningbo Futai Electric Limited. (Chen, Alan) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34321860 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Ningbo Futai Electric Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Alan C Chen added to party Ningbo Futai Electric Limited(pty:pla))(Chen, Alan) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less