This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2021 at 09:56:06 (UTC).

Nine Energy Service, Inc. v. NCS Multistage Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 Nine Energy Service, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against NCS Multistage Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00209

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nine Energy Service, Inc.

Defendants

NCS Multistage Inc.

NCS Multistage, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hilary Lovett Preston

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins LLP

2801 Via Fortuna - Suite 100

Austin, TX 78746-7568

Parker Douglas Hancock

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins L.L.P.

1001 Fannin Street, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77002-6760

Sean P. Belding

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins LLP

1001 Fannin Street, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77002-6760

Jeffrey T. Han

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins LLP

2801 Via Fortuna, Suite 100

Austin, TX 78746

Defendant Attorneys

Domingo Manuel Llagostera

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue

Houston, TX 77002

Munira A. Jesani

Attorney at Blank Rome, LLP

717 Texas Avenue, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Russell T. Wong

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Claim Chart Comparing Airlock to Claim 1 of the '053 Patent

1 #1

Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 10,871,053

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot2) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nine Energy Service, Inc. (Preston, Hilary) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Discovery Hearing held on 3/25/2021. The Court heard the parties discovery issues and made decisions. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(bw) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER Setting Zoom Discovery for 3/25/2021 03:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot2) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: NCS Multistage Inc. answer due 4/26/2021; NCS Multistage, LLC answer due 4/26/2021. (am) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Defendants Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer Original Complaint. Having considered the motion, the Court hereby GRANTS the motion. IT IS ORDERED that the new deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Original Complaint is April 26, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by NCS Multistage Inc., NCS Multistage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Domingo Manuel Llagostera on behalf of NCS Multistage Inc., NCS Multistage, LLC (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Munira A. Jesani on behalf of NCS Multistage Inc., NCS Multistage, LLC (Jesani, Munira) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell T. Wong on behalf of NCS Multistage Inc., NCS Multistage, LLC (Wong, Russell) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to NCS Multistage Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Nine Energy Service, Inc.. on NCS Multistage Inc. (Preston, Hilary) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to NCS Multistage, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Nine Energy Service, Inc.. on NCS Multistage, LLC (Preston, Hilary) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nine Energy Service, Inc.. (Preston, Hilary) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Preston, Hilary) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14557487), filed by Nine Energy Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 10,871,053, #2 Exhibit B - Claim Chart Comparing Airlock to Claim 1 of the '053 Patent, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Preston, Hilary) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nine Energy Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where NCS Multistage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey T. Han

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hilary Preston