On September 24, 2021, Nimitz Technologies LLC (“Nimitz” or “Plaintiff”), filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Twitter, Inc. (“Twitter” or “Defendant”), seeking damages along with pre-and post-judgement interest for the alleged infringement of a United States Patent owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the District of Delaware.
The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent No. 7,848,328, entitled “Broadcast Content Encapsulation” (the “’328 Patent”) owned by the Plaintiff.
In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “The Patent disclosed and exemplified a unique and valuable system and method for delivering multiple versions of content which are mapped to streams carrying data for those multiple versions. The data streams are encapsulated into User Datagram Protocol (UDP) packets; the UDP destination port fields of the packets are given component-identifying values. A user equipment (UE) receiving the transmitted service identifies desired components based on the UDP destination port field values. The UE further encapsulates desired component UDP packets into Internet Protocol (IP) packets, and may assign component-identifying values to fields of the IP packets (e.g., the IP source address and/or IP destination address).”
The Plaintiff further alleged that, “The method claims are patent eligible under 35 U.S.C. § 101. The claims are not abstract. As reflected in the Notice of Allowance, the claims are directed to a novel improvement that, unlike conventional art, comprises assigning a specific value to each component for a predefined field of a packet according to a second communication protocol, with the specific value distinguishing the component from other components, and the encapsulating comprises encapsulating the packet streams according to one or more lower layer protocols without encapsulating the packet streams according to the second communication protocol.”
The Plaintiff also alleged that, “The ‘328 Patent claims focus on specific improvements in computer capabilities as opposed to an invention that simply uses computers as a tool. The focus of the claimed advance is on a solution to a technological problem arising in computer operations and provides a specific improvement in computer capabilities or functionality, rather than only claiming a desirable result or function. Twitter has practiced and continues to practice the method of at least Claim 1 of the ‘328 Patent by streaming the content found in https://www.Twitter.com (“Accused Instrumentality”). As a result of Defendant’s infringement of the ’328 Patent, Plaintiff has suffered damages.”
There is only one claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, for alleged infringement of The ’328 Patent owned by the Plaintiff.
In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court for an adjudication that Defendant had infringed the ’328 Patent, an award of damages to be paid by Defendant adequate to compensate Plaintiff for Defendant’s past infringement of the ’328 Patent, including pre-judgment and post-judgment interest, costs, expenses, and an accounting of all infringing acts along with any and all such further relief at law or in equity that the Court may deem just and proper, including but not limited to attorneys’ fees.
This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.
1:21-CV-01364
09/27/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Patent
Colm F. Connolly
Nimitz Technologies LLC
Twitter, Inc.
George Pazuniak
Exhibit 1
Exhibit 2
Civil Cover Sheet
(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. Twitter, Inc. served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Respond to Complaint to December 3, 2021 - filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
DocketSO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Respond to Complaint to December 3, 2021 filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Twitter, Inc. answer due 12/3/2021. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/13/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Respond to Complaint to December 3, 2021 - filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. Twitter, Inc. served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
[-] Read LessDocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01360-CFC, 1:21-cv-01362-CFC, 1:21-cv-01363-CFC, 1:21-cv-01364-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 09/29/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (nmg) (Entered: 09/27/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,848,328. (nmg) (Entered: 09/27/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 09/27/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Twitter, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3708166.) - filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 09/27/2021)
[-] Read Less