This case was last updated from PACER on 09/17/2021 at 13:56:01 (UTC).

Nimitz Technologies LLC v. Reddit, Inc.

Case Summary

On August 30, 2021, Nimitz Technologies LLC (“Nimitz” or “Plaintiff”), represented by George Pazuniak of O'Kelly & Ernst, LLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Reddit, Inc. (“Reddit” or “Defendant”), seeking an award of damages including pre-judgment and post-judgment interest for the alleged infringement of United States Patent owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the District of Delaware with Judge Colm F. Connolly presiding.

 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent No.

7,848,328, entitled “Broadcast Content Encapsulation” (the “’328 Patent”) owned by the Plaintiff.

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “The Patent disclosed and exemplified a unique and valuable system and method for delivering multiple versions of content which are mapped to streams carrying data for those multiple versions. The data streams are encapsulated into User Datagram Protocol (UDP) packets; the UDP destination port fields of the packets are given component-identifying values. A user equipment (UE) receiving the transmitted service identifies desired components based on the UDP destination port field values. The UE further encapsulates desired component UDP packets into Internet Protocol (IP) packets, and may assign component-identifying values to fields of the IP packets.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “The ‘328 Patent claims focus on specific improvements in computer capabilities as opposed to an invention that simply uses computers as a tool. The focus of the claimed advance is on a solution to a technological problem arising in computer operations and provides a specific improvement in computer capabilities or functionality, rather than only claiming a desirable result or function. Reddit has practiced and continues to practice the method of at least Claim 1 of the ‘328 Patent by streaming the content as “Reddit” (“Accused Instrumentality”).”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Claim 1 and its dependent claims, individually and as an ordered combination, recite an inventive concept, which is manifestly more than the application of an abstract idea using well-understood, routine, and conventional activities previously known to the industry. As stated by the Examiner, prior to the present invention, there was no prior art disclosing a system and method for encapsulating data streams, and particularly where the data streams related to a specific content that is mapped to components of a transmission service that delivers multiple versions of that specific content. Only method claims of the ‘328 Patent are being asserted, and, thus, patent marking is not an issue. In any event, Nimitz has not commercialized any products under the ‘328 Patent and has no information that any prior owners of the Patent have not complied with patent marking requirements.”

 

The only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff deals with the alleged infringement of the ’328 Patent.

 

In its prayer for relief the Plaintiff has requested the Court for an adjudication that Defendant had infringed the ’328 Patent and an award of damages to be paid by Defendant adequate to compensate Plaintiff for Defendant’s past infringement of the ’328 Patent, including pre and post-judgment interest, costs, expenses, and an accounting of all infringing acts along with such further relief at law or in equity that the court may deem just and proper.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01249

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nimitz Technologies LLC

Defendant

Reddit, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Pazuniak

Attorney at O'Kelly & Ernst, LLC

824 N. Market Street, Suite 1001A

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Respond to Complaint to November 5, 2021 - filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. Reddit, Inc. served on 8/31/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (srs) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,848,328. (srs) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Reddit, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3688447.) - filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To Respond to Complaint to November 5, 2021 - filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. Reddit, Inc. served on 8/31/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01246-CFC, 1:21-cv-01247-CFC, 1:21-cv-01248-CFC, 1:21-cv-01249-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (srs) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,848,328. (srs) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Reddit, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3688447.) - filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REDDIT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George Pazuniak