This case was last updated from PACER on 09/17/2021 at 13:49:15 (UTC).

Nimitz Technologies LLC v. Pinterest, Inc.

Case Summary

On August 30, 2021, Nimitz Technologies LLC (“Nimitz” or “Plaintiff”), represented by George Pazuniak of O'Kelly & Ernst, LLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Pinterest, Inc. (“Defendant” or “Pinterest”), seeking an accounting of damages along with adjudication and prejudgment and post-judgment interest for the alleged infringement of the ’328 Patent owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the District of Delaware with Judge Colm F. Connolly presiding.

 

The Plaintiff filed the complaint for the alleged infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,848,328 (the “’328 Patent”) owned by Plaintiff.

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “In violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271(a), Pinterest has practiced and continues to practice the method of at least Claim 1 of the ‘328 Patent by streaming the content found in https://Pinterest.com/ (“Accused Instrumentality”).”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Thus, the ‘328 Patent claims focus on specific improvements in computer capabilities as opposed to an invention that simply uses computers as a tool. The focus of the claimed advance is on a solution to a technological problem arising in computer operations and provides a specific improvement in computer capabilities or functionality, rather than only claiming a desirable result or function.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “As a result of Defendant’s infringement of the ’328 Patent, Plaintiff has suffered damages.” and also that “Only method claims of the ‘328 Patent are being asserted, and, thus, patent marking is not an issue. In any event, Nimitz has not commercialized any products under the ‘328 Patent and has no information that any prior owners of the Patent have not complied with patent marking requirements.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Nimitz is entitled to a money judgment in an amount adequate to compensate for Defendant’s infringement, but in no event less than a reasonable royalty for the use made of the invention by Defendant, together with interest and costs as fixed by the Court.”

 

The only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff is for the alleged infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,848,328 (the “’328 Patent”).

 

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court to pass an award of damages to be paid by the Defendant adequate to compensate Plaintiff for Defendant’s past infringement of the ’328 Patent, including pre-judgment and post-judgment interest, costs, expenses, and an accounting of all infringing acts and an adjudication that the Defendant had infringed the ’328 Patent or any other relief that the Court deems just and proper.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01248

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nimitz Technologies LLC

Defendant

Pinterest, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Pazuniak

Attorney at O'Kelly & Ernst, LLC

824 N. Market Street, Suite 1001A

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. Pinterest, Inc. served on 8/31/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (twk) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,848,328. (twk) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Pinterest, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3688425.) - filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. Pinterest, Inc. served on 8/31/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01246-CFC, 1:21-cv-01247-CFC, 1:21-cv-01248-CFC, 1:21-cv-01249-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (twk) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,848,328. (twk) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Pinterest, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3688425.) - filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pinterest, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George Pazuniak