This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/27/2022 at 08:17:15 (UTC).

Nimitz Technologies LLC v. Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 Nimitz Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00429

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Nimitz Technologies LLC

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff

Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Raymond W Mort, III

Attorney at The Mort Law Firm, PLLC

501 Congress Ave, Suite 150

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

Lance E. Wyatt, Jr.

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Neil J. McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, PC

1717 Main Street, Suite 50000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15977197), filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC. (sv) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J. McNabnay on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC. Attorney Neil J. McNabnay added to party Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC(pty:dft) (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC re #1 Complaint (Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ajeet Baranwal)(Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

8 #1

Exhibit A - Declaration of Ajeet Baranwal

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Nimitz Technologies LLC by Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC.(Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#10

(#10) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Oncor Electric Delivery Holdings Company LLC, Corporate Parent Texas Transmission Investment LLC, Corporate Parent Sempra Energy, Corporate Parent OMERS Administration Corporation, Other Affiliate OMERS Infrastructure Management Inc., Other Affiliate GIC Private Limited for Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC, Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC. (Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Oncor Electric Delivery Holdings Company LLC, Corporate Parent Texas Transmission Investment LLC, Corporate Parent Sempra Energy, Corporate Parent OMERS Administration Corporation, Other Affiliate OMERS Infrastructure Management Inc., Other Affiliate GIC Private Limited for Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC, Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC. (Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Nimitz Technologies LLC by Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC.(Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ajeet Baranwal)(Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketReset Answer Deadlines: Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC answer due 6/22/2022. (sv) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC re #1 Complaint (Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J. McNabnay on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC. Attorney Neil J. McNabnay added to party Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC(pty:dft) (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (sv) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC. (sv) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15977197), filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nimitz Technologies LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lance Eric Wyatt, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil J McNabnay