This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2021 at 07:04:41 (UTC).

Nimitz Technologies LLC v. Conde Nast Entertainment LLC

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 Nimitz Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Conde Nast Entertainment LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01360

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nimitz Technologies LLC

Defendant

Conde Nast Entertainment LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Pazuniak

Attorney at O'Kelly & Ernst, LLC

824 N. Market Street, Suite 1001A

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

Jennifer Ying

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Conde Nast Entertainment LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3708145.) - filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,848,328. (mal) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#4

(#4) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to December 9, 2021 - filed by Conde Nast Entertainment LLC. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to December 9, 2021 filed by Conde Nast Entertainment LLC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Conde Nast Entertainment LLC answer due 12/9/2021. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/14/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to December 9, 2021 - filed by Conde Nast Entertainment LLC. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01360-CFC, 1:21-cv-01362-CFC, 1:21-cv-01363-CFC, 1:21-cv-01364-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,848,328. (mal) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Conde Nast Entertainment LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3708145.) - filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nimitz Technologies LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Conde Nast Entertainment LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Ying