This case was last updated from PACER on 10/29/2021 at 08:08:49 (UTC).

Nimitz Technologies LLC v. CNET Media, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 Nimitz Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against CNET Media, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01247

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Nimitz Technologies LLC

Counter Claimant and Defendant

CNET Media, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

George Pazuniak

Attorney at O'Kelly & Ernst, LLC

824 N. Market Street, Suite 1001A

Wilmington, DE 19801

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Jeremy Douglas Anderson

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Lance E. Wyatt

Neil J. McNabnay

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1)(Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Nimitz Technologies LLC.(Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To File Answering Brief to October 26, 2021 filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: CNET Media, Inc. answer due 10/26/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/1/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To File Answering Brief to October 26, 2021 - filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorneys Lance E. Wyatt and Neil J. McNabnay for CNET Media, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil J. McNabnay and Lance Wyatt filed by CNET Media, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/21/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil J. McNabnay and Lance Wyatt - filed by CNET Media, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by CNET Media, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with jury demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Nimitz Technologies LLC by CNET Media, Inc..(Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by CNET Media, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/5/2021. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by CNET Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. CNET Media, Inc. served on 8/31/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01246-CFC, 1:21-cv-01247-CFC, 1:21-cv-01248-CFC, 1:21-cv-01249-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (nmg) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,848,328. (nmg) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against CNET Media, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3688414.) - filed by Nimitz Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lance Eric Wyatt, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy Douglas Anderson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil J McNabnay