This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2022 at 08:14:07 (UTC).

Nikollbibaj et al v. U.S. Foods, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 Nikollbibaj filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against U S Foods, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas M. Durkin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06914

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Durkin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jav Nikollbibaj

Geoff De Weaver

Defendants

U.S. Foods, Inc.

Pietro Satriano

Steve Robinson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Huntley Mora

120 W. Madisonsuite 600

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jav Nikollbibaj, Geoff De Weaver; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19006779. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mora, Steven) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: By 3/14/2022, the parties are to file a joint status report. The parties may refer to the format detailed on the Court's website under New and Reassigned cases. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: By 3/14/2022, the parties are to file a joint status report. The parties may refer to the format detailed on the Court's website under New and Reassigned cases. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lxk, ) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, ) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jav Nikollbibaj, Geoff De Weaver; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19006779. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mora, Steven) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US FOODS, INC. is a litigant