This case was last updated from PACER on 11/12/2021 at 08:42:07 (UTC).

Nike, Inc. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Nike, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara L. Ellis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04826

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara L. Ellis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nike, Inc.

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Linqinli Trading Co., Ltd

Qilong Trading Company

Penghua Trading Company

1MA34JYW14Q

1MA34N84RXN

CreaTive

AUOBAG

ChaoYangQuPengZhiYuanShangMaoXing

MEINIHAO

QingDaoRongGuanFaZhiPinYouXianGongSi

goodrelics

wenjiahaobeimei

Mushroom pink

bingeshop

continue burst

DDJOWN

wangyangyongdfsgdsg

A1G17U6VPQLMGW

128 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Martin Francis Trainor

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jake Michael Christensen

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker Drive, #2500

Chicago, IL 60606

RiKaleigh C. Johnson

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 10/21/2021. Mailed notice(rj, ) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Linqinli Trading Co., Ltd, Qilong Trading Company, Penghua Trading Company, 1MA34JYW14Q, 1MA34N84RXN, CreaTive, AUOBAG, ChaoYangQuPengZhiYuanShangMaoXing, MEINIHAO, QingDaoRongGuanFaZhiPinYouXianGongSi, goodrelics, wenjiahaobeimei, Mushroom pink, bingeshop, continue burst, DDJOWN, wangyangyongdfsgdsg, A1G17U6VPQLMGW, FishCoo, EAST-Tech-us, gao minjiell, A1KD19S5DY9RJX, ERGF, uumaocao, Koubeen, NICLUM US, WuHanRenLiangMaoYiHang, BARBER PRO, pingdingxianlitianjiadianjingxiaoweixiubu, Lanyard with ID Badge us, KOYODA, JUSUWK, xielinqings, Henmay.store, haiqingshangmao1, E-P Games, cbf2025, guangzhoushizengchengqusiweishangmaoyouxiangongsi, Xinluoqujieshuangt ingbaihuodian, nanpingshijianyangquzhuangyunshuiwujindian, Xinrun company, A214614LFATAMA, AUDNEMS, DaFengQuAnHaoBaiHuoDian, Klisa Losa, WTBNiber, Huzhou Zhili Qingqi Clothing Trading Co., Ltd., Lonesong, QinFuZhongMaoYiHang, Ke Zhijia, Honifansu, ChangChunShiJiuChengHunNingTuYouXianGong, HuiZhouShiHuiChengQuTaiLiNiuRouHuoGuoDian, QAUPPE Shoes, A2ITEC1YNF2BFV, ADOR LUCKY STEP, RAYIMA, Hongchenyun, HAIRKAIR, lianchengxianrongangyuebaihuodian, CZLongShops, jinghexinchengduojingyubaihuodian, xclssm, chenhuan shop, JDHY (delivered in 12 days), ma cheng shi sha yang bai huo dian, Sincereast, KerSK US, Dongzhifang, FannyShop, KUNFYQUAN, JZZ Store, fangfoxiaobaihuodian, shiminglongkkk, Sacchar, Houlishang, Fujian Xinrongda dianzi gongcheng youxiangongsi, weishanxiazhenyancuobaihuodian, shang wei wei, dfncd, Visit the stylup Store, Backpack Official, jinghexinchengxiaodaitongbaihuodian, A3I0GU4KDZWE8X, JUS01, huaiyinquzixiubangongyongpindian, Chui&June, lhtlsmyxgs, flowermade, melo-, ShanDongTianYuNongZiYouXiaGongSi, Superstar No. 23 Backpack Shop, A3LLOVLRJXN9R3, Shenzhen Walner Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd, Thunder e-commerce, XiaPuXianQiaSiRiYongPinJingYingBu, KIVIVO Direct, LI-LING-US, AZAKKA Co., jinghexinchengyuejinliebaihuodian, qiuziling88, Taikangxianweihongbaihuodian, changchunshifushengshangmaoxing, KJaoihab, huanquben8y, qichuangshangmaoyouxiangongsi, tokpazee, XiaoC, Season's Secret Store, cheng du xin chang bei shang mao you xian gong si, MaWeiJun, GETSWOW-US, NZXS HM, GuangZhouZhenYanMaoYiYouXianGongSi3, qingbaijianghaohuomanbaihuodian, LICHI HOME STYLE, PYLH, AOIUQHL3G2L4Q, Super Buying, Carmel decoration, Valuabag, ARIY8HUM1GMHL, LilChaos, putianshilichengqumuxuanfuzhuangdian, JDZLANTU, JAMIB, AZ99XTEHB3WBG, 2017pingan, pkpc3252, saiisonetoys, zhuangzhoufandian, HJ66, MerlinAndrewhZnO, zhongshan Store, zengzixuan3011, siqintu7011, lifeilong39, liuhongyan4636, lizengtan245, luchunyang4117, shangjiankang77830, jirao87673, liguangyun21375, wuyating9974, baizhenghua49184 and maicuo added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #29 . The Court strikes the status date set for 10/20/2021 and resets it to 12/2/2021 at 1:30 p.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nike, Inc. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 10/13/2021, answer due 11/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin F. Trainor)(Trainor, Martin) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nike, Inc. by Martin Francis Trainor (Trainor, Martin) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #29 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 10/20/2021 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MEMORANDUM by Nike, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #29 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION by Plaintiff Nike, Inc. for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" (sxh, ) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Nike, Inc. (Document not scanned). (jn, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (cp, ) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, ) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nike, Inc. by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nike, Inc. by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nike, Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nike, Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Nike, Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Nike, Inc. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Nike, Inc.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18658972. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nike, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin Francis Trainor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RiKaleigh C. Johnson