This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:38:15 (UTC).

Nigg-Johnson v. Lewis Family Drug, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Nigg-Johnson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Lewis Family Drug, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy E. Brasel and Leo I. Brisbois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-00058

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy E. Brasel

Referral Judge

Leo I. Brisbois

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ellen Nigg-Johnson

Defendant

Lewis Family Drug, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin Anderson

18 East Division, P.O. Box 1014

Elbow Lake, MN 56531-1014

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Stevenson Bogue, II

Attorney at McGrath North Mullin & Kratz, PC LLO

1601 Dodge St. Ste 3700

Omaha, NE 68102

Jonathan P Norrie

Attorney at Bassford Remele

100 South 5Th Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1254

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Lewis Family Drug, LLC. (Norrie, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#6

(#6) PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE AND ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2020 at 01:30 PM in Edward J. Devitt Courtroom (STP) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MMP) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

6 #1

Consent Form

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Traverse County District Court (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7377877) filed by Lewis Family Drug, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 FILED IN ERROR-DIRECTED TO REFILE-Exhibit(s) Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Norrie, Jonathan) Modified text on 1/6/2020 (lmb). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) EXHIBIT Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Norrie, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

#7

(#7) LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Lewis Family Drug, LLC . (Norrie, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#2

(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Jonathan P. Norrie re #1 Notice of Removal, byLewis Family Drug, LLC. (Norrie, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ONLY ORDER- The Pretrial Conference that was scheduled for Tuesday, March 24, 2020, in St. Paul is hereby CANCELLED. The Pretrial Conference is RESET for Thursday, April 2, 2020, at 10:30 a.m., in Courtroom 3, Duluth, Minnesota. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/28/2020. (MMP) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Lewis Family Drug, LLC . (Norrie, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE AND ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2020 at 01:30 PM in Edward J. Devitt Courtroom (STP) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MMP) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Lewis Family Drug, LLC. (Norrie, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) EXHIBIT Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Norrie, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (6th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 20-cv-58 (NEB/LIB). (lmb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Jonathan P. Norrie re #1 Notice of Removal, byLewis Family Drug, LLC. (Norrie, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Traverse County District Court (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7377877) filed by Lewis Family Drug, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 FILED IN ERROR-DIRECTED TO REFILE-Exhibit(s) Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Norrie, Jonathan) Modified text on 1/6/2020 (lmb). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.