This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:21:27 (UTC).

Niewolak v. CITY OF HIGHLAND PARK, MI et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Niewolak filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CITY OF HIGHLAND PARK, MI. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terrence G. Berg and Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13386

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence G. Berg

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Niewolak

Defendants

SGT Heather Holcomb

SGT Keath Bartynski

CITY OF HIGHLAND PARK, MI

LT Edwards

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel G. Romano

23880 Woodward Avenue

Pleasant Ridge, MI 48069

Defendant Attorney

James W. McGinnis

985 E. Jefferson Avenue, Suite 100

Detroit, MI 48207

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT 19-13386 filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7489654 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Romano, Daniel) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by James W. McGinnis on behalf of All Defendants. (McGinnis, James) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (McGinnis, James) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Keath Bartynski, CITY OF HIGHLAND PARK, MI, Edwards, Heather Holcomb* (DAll) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (McGinnis, James) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by James W. McGinnis on behalf of All Defendants. (McGinnis, James) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Error directed to: James W. McGinnis re #3 Notice of Appearance. Wrong or incomplete PDF image was uploaded. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [DOCUMENT IS BLANK] [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (NAhm) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) [STRICKEN] NOTICE of Appearance by James W. McGinnis on behalf of All Defendants. (McGinnis, James) Modified on 1/2/2020 (NAhm). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Keath Bartynski, CITY OF HIGHLAND PARK, MI, Edwards, Heather Holcomb* (DAll) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT 19-13386 filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7489654 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Romano, Daniel) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.