This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2021 at 12:44:03 (UTC).

Nieves-Ortiz v. Corporacion del Centro Cardiovascular de

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 Nieves-Ortiz filed an Other - False Claims Act lawsuit against Corporacion del Centro Cardiovascular de. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aida M. Delgado-Colon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01717

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - False Claims Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aida M. Delgado-Colon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dr. Omar Nieves-Ortiz

Defendants

Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co.

Heart Rhythm Management PSC

Edgardo Hernndez-Vil

Corporacin del Centro Cardiovascular de Puerto Rico y del Caribe

Dr. Juan Carlos Sotomonte-Ariza

Edgardo Hernandez-Vila

Corporacion del Centro Cardiovascular de Puerto Rico y del Caribe

Gary Hernandez-Vila

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Judith Berkan

Attorney at Berkan & Mendez

Defendant Attorneys

Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada

Attorney at Indiano & Williams, P.S.C.

207 Del Parque St., 3Rd Floor

San Juan, PR 00912

Vanesa Vicens

Attorney at Indiano & Williams, PSC

207 Del Parque Street, Third Floor

San Juan, PR 00912

Jeffrey M. Williams-English

Attorney at Indiano & Williams, PSC

207 Del Parque Street, Third Floor

San Juan, PR 00912

David C. Indiano-Vicic

Attorney at Indiano & Williams, PSC

207 Del Parque Street, Third Floor

San Juan, PR 00912

Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina

P.O. Box 22763, Upr Station

San Juan, PR 00931-2763

Manuel Fernandez-Bared

Attorney at Toro, Colon, Mullet, PSC

Po Box 195383

San Juan, PR 00919-5383

Monica L. Vega-Quintana

Attorney at Monica Vega Law Offices PSC

Po Box 191652

San Juan, PR 00919-1652

Nayda I. Perez-Roman

416 Ponce De Leon, Union Plaza Bldg. Suite 311

San Juan, PR 00918

Miguel J. Ortega-Nunez

Attorney at Cancio, Nadal, Rivera & Diaz

P.O. Box 364966

San Juan, PR 00936-4966

 

Court Documents

#24

#22

#21

#19

#16

#13

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Summons

#3

1 #6

Summons Edgardo Hernandez

1 #5

Summons Dr. Sotomonte

1 #4

Summons Medtronic PR Operations

1 #3

Summons Corp del Centro Cardiovascular

1 #2

Category Sheet form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet form

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER re #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.Granted. Edgardo Hernandez-Vila's answer due by 3/8/2021. Absent exigent circumstances, no further extensions of time will be granted. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/8/2021. (wm) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Second MOTION for Extension of Time until March 8, 2021 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Nayda I. Perez-Roman on behalf of Edgardo Hernandez-Vila Responses due by 2/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Roman, Nayda) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER re #22 Motion for extension of time. Granted. Heart Rhythm Management PSC and Dr. Juan Carlos Sotomonte-Ariza's answer due by March 3, 2021. Absent exigent circumstances, no further extensions will be granted. Answer deadline due by 3/3/2021. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/2/2021. (wm) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Second MOTION for extension of time until March 3, 2021 to to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Vanesa Vicens on behalf of Heart Rhythm Management PSC, Dr. Juan Carlos Sotomonte-Ariza Responses due by 2/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicens, Vanesa) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Monica L. Vega-Quintana on behalf of Edgardo Hernandez-Vila (Vega-Quintana, Monica) (Entered: 01/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer deadline due by 3/3/2021. Absent exigent circumstances, no further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 1/25/2021. (wm) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Second MOTION for Extension of Time until March 4, 2021 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: 7 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed by Miguel J. Ortega-Nunez on behalf of Corporacion del Centro Cardiovascular de Puerto Rico y del Caribe Responses due by 2/5/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 7 ) (Ortega-Nunez, Miguel) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline due by 2/8/2021. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 1/15/2021. (wm) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline due by 2/12/2021. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 1/15/2021. (wm) Modified deadline on 1/15/2021 (idg). (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time until February 12, 2021 to File Answer filed by Nayda I. Perez-Roman on behalf of Edgardo Hernandez-Vila Responses due by 1/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Roman, Nayda) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada on behalf of Heart Rhythm Management PSC (Vazquez-Lozada, Jose) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Williams-English on behalf of Heart Rhythm Management PSC (Williams-English, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER re #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted. Dr. Juan Carlos Sotomonte-Ariza's answer to the complaint due by February 8, 2021. Answer deadline due by 2/8/2021. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 1/4/2021. (wm) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER re #5 Motion for extension of time. Granted. Corporacion del Centro Cardiovascular de Puerto Rico y del Caribe's Answer to the complaint due by February 2, 2021. Answer deadline due by 2/2/2021. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 1/4/2021. (wm) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time until February 8, 2021 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by Dr. Omar Nieves-Ortiz filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Dr. Juan Carlos Sotomonte-Ariza Responses due by 1/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for extension of time until February 2, 2021 to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Miguel J. Ortega-Nunez on behalf of Corporacion del Centro Cardiovascular de Puerto Rico y del Caribe Responses due by 1/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ortega-Nunez, Miguel) (Entered: 01/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Dr. Juan Carlos Sotomonte-Ariza (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Corporacion del Centro Cardiovascular de Puerto Rico y del Caribe, Heart Rhythm Management PSC, Edgardo Hernandez-Vil, Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co., Dr. Juan Carlos Sotomonte-Ariza (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. (vdm) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7119436.), filed by Dr. Omar Nieves-Ortiz. Service due by 3/15/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet form, #2 Category Sheet form, #3 Summons Corp del Centro Cardiovascular, #4 Summons Medtronic PR Operations, #5 Summons Dr. Sotomonte, #6 Summons Edgardo Hernandez, #7 Summons Heart Rhythm)(Berkan, Judith) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nayda I. Perez-Roman(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Miguel J. Ortega-Nunez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Manuel Fernandez-Bared